Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0219162 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0219162



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 335
26.06.1997 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
26.06.1997 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
20.06.1997 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
27.05.1997 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
27.05.1997 French translation of claims Opposition 2
27.05.1997 German translation of the claims Opposition 2
28.02.1997 Claims Opposition 2
28.02.1997 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 3
28.02.1997 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 4
28.02.1997 Description Opposition 4
28.02.1997 Description Opposition 2
28.02.1997 Drawings Opposition 1
17.02.1997 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
14.02.1997 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
14.02.1997 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
22.01.1997 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
22.01.1997 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
14.01.1997 Annex to a communication Appeal 1
14.01.1997 Claims Appeal 2
14.01.1997 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 17
14.01.1997 Description Appeal 2
14.01.1997 Description Appeal 4
14.01.1997 Drawings Appeal 1
14.01.1997 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 2
30.09.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
23.09.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
21.09.1996 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
21.09.1996 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
13.09.1996 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
13.09.1996 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
13.09.1996 Oral proceedings: Annex to summons Appeal 4
11.09.1996 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
27.08.1996 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
27.08.1996 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
26.02.1996 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
14.07.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
05.07.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
28.03.1994 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
09.03.1994 Claims Appeal 1
09.03.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 13
25.01.1994 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
21.01.1994 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
21.01.1994 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
18.11.1993 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
15.11.1993 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
09.11.1993 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 6
24.09.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Appeal 1
03.09.1993 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
03.09.1993 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
21.08.1993 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
23.07.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.07.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
20.07.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
20.07.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.07.1993 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
16.07.1993 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
16.07.1993 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 9
16.07.1993 Means of redress Opposition 1
19.06.1993 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
19.06.1993 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
26.04.1993 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
26.04.1993 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.04.1993 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
16.04.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 2
14.04.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 26
26.03.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.03.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 1
11.03.1993 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
03.03.1993 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
23.02.1993 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
05.02.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
05.02.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
03.02.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
02.02.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
29.01.1993 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
29.01.1993 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
29.01.1993 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
22.01.1993 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
21.01.1993 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
12.01.1993 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
12.01.1993 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.12.1992 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
21.07.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
09.07.1992 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 3
15.05.1992 Communication about missing advice of delivery Opposition 1
10.04.1992 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
03.04.1992 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
03.03.1992 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
22.02.1992 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
02.01.1992 Annex to the communication Opposition 6
02.01.1992 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
18.07.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
03.07.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 2
03.07.1991 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 10
01.07.1991 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
13.06.1991 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
19.02.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.02.1991 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
13.02.1991 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
05.02.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
05.02.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
26.01.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
10.01.1991 Request for documents Opposition 1
28.11.1990 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
25.10.1990 Authorisation Opposition 1
25.10.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 9
02.02.1990 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
31.01.1990 Notice of opposition Opposition 5
27.12.1989 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
17.10.1989 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
17.10.1989 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
17.10.1989 German translation of the claims Search / examination 1
21.07.1989 Communication about missing advice of delivery Search / examination 1
21.07.1989 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
04.07.1989 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
17.04.1989 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
17.04.1989 Text intended for grant Search / examination 7
06.04.1989 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
21.03.1989 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
27.02.1989 Claims Search / examination 1
27.02.1989 Description Search / examination 3
27.02.1989 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
24.02.1989 Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) Search / examination 1
17.02.1989 Claims Search / examination 1
17.02.1989 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 1
20.01.1989 Claims Search / examination 1
20.01.1989 Description Search / examination 3
20.01.1989 Description Search / examination 2
20.01.1989 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
29.09.1988 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
21.10.1987 Annex Search / examination 1
21.10.1987 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
18.05.1987 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
28.04.1987 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
11.03.1987 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
25.02.1987 Refund of (partial) search fee Search / examination 1
16.02.1987 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
16.02.1987 European search report Search / examination 2
30.10.1986 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
03.10.1986 Abstract Search / examination 1
03.10.1986 Authorisation Search / examination 1
03.10.1986 Claims Search / examination 1
03.10.1986 Description Search / examination 4
03.10.1986 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
03.10.1986 Letter concerning fees and payments Search / examination 1
03.10.1986 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
03.10.1986 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 1
03.10.1986 Priority document Search / examination 6
03.10.1986 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10
03.10.1986 Translation of priority document Search / examination 9