blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0235401

EP0235401 - Power supply switch circuit [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  12.11.1990
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TEKTRONIX, INC.
Tektronix Industrial Park D/S Y3-121 4900 S.W. Griffith Drive P.O. Box 500 Beaverton
Oregon 97077 / US
[N/P]
Former [1987/37]For all designated states
TEKTRONIX, INC.
Tektronix Industrial Park D/S Y3-121 4900 S.W. Griffith Drive P.O. Box 500
Beaverton Oregon 97077 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Pepper, Steven H.
10838 N.W. Laidlaw
Portland Oregon 97229 / US
[1987/37]
Representative(s)van der Arend, Adrianus G.A., et al
van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241
NL-2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
[N/P]
Former [1987/37]van der Arend, Adrianus G.A., Ir., et al
van Exter Polak & Charlouis B.V., P.O. Box 3241
NL-2280 GE Rijswijk / NL
Application number, filing date86201746.408.10.1986
[1987/37]
Priority number, dateUS1986083549203.03.1986         Original published format: US 835492
[1987/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0235401
Date:09.09.1987
Language:EN
[1987/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.04.1987
ClassificationIPC:G05F1/46, H03K17/60
[1987/37]
CPC:
H02J9/061 (EP,US); Y02B70/30 (EP); Y04S20/20 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1987/37]
TitleGerman:Energieversorgungsschaltanordnung[1987/37]
English:Power supply switch circuit[1987/37]
French:Circuit de commutation pour source d'alimentation[1987/37]
File destroyed:19.06.1996
Examination procedure04.09.1987Examination requested  [1987/45]
05.01.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.04.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.10.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
04.12.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.05.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.07.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
10.09.1990Fee for grant paid
10.09.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
26.10.1990Application withdrawn by applicant  [1991/01]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.09.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
14.09.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
11.09.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US3714469  (UCHIDA K);
 [A]EP0151856  (SHARP KK [JP]);
 [A]US3979741  (HARSHBARGER JOHN H)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.