blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0193260

EP0193260 - Prostacyclin derivatives [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  16.12.1992
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
CHINOIN Gyogyszer és Vegyészeti Termékek Gyára RT.
To utca 1-5
H-1045 Budapest IV / HU
[N/P]
Former [1986/36]For all designated states
CHINOIN Gyogyszer és Vegyészeti Termékek Gyára RT.
To utca 1-5
H-1045 Budapest IV / HU
Inventor(s)01 / Galambos, Geza
6 Petöfi u
H-1195 Budapest / HU
02 / Kanay, Karoly
7 Marko u
H-1055 Budapest / HU
03 / Ivanics, Jozsef
20 Elem u
H-1045 Budapest / HU
04 / Tomoskozy, István
6 Pazsonyi ut
H-1045 Budapest / HU
05 / Dorman, György
Kondorosi u 15 Fsz. 4
H-1116 Budapest / HU
06 / Kovacs, Gabor
4 Rona Park
H-1142 Budapest / HU
07 / Stadler, István
18 Népstadion ut
H-1143 Budapest / HU
08 / Kormoczi, Peter
33 Uri u
H-1014 Budapest / HU
09 / Hadhazy, Pál
31B Baranyai u
H-1117 Budapest / HU
10 / Virag, Sandor
29/A Sallai I.u
H-1136 Budapest / HU
11 / Kiss, Miklos
15 Dallos I.u
H-1046 Budapest / HU
[1986/50]
Former [1986/36]01 / Galambos, Geza
6 Petöfi u
H-1195 Budapest / HU
02 / Kanay, Karoly
7 Marko u
H-1055 Budapest / HU
03 / Ivanics, Jozsef
20 Elem u
H-1045 Budapest / HU
04 / Tomoskozy, István
6 Pazsonyi ut
H-1045 Budapest / HU
05 / Dorman, György
50 Prater u
H-1083 Budapest / HU
06 / Kovacs, Gabor
4 Rona Park
H-1142 Budapest / HU
07 / Stadler, István
18 Népstadion ut
H-1143 Budapest / HU
08 / Kormoczi, Peter
33 Uri u
H-1014 Budapest / HU
09 / Hadhazy, Pál
31B Baranyai u
H-1117 Budapest / HU
10 / Virag, Sandor
29/A Sallai I.u
H-1136 Budapest / HU
11 / Kiss, Miklos
15 Dallos I.u
H-1046 Budapest / HU
Representative(s)Skailes, Humphrey John, et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co., European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1986/36]Skailes, Humphrey John, et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UZ / GB
Application number, filing date86300306.717.01.1986
[1986/36]
Priority number, dateHU1985000019517.01.1985         Original published format: HU 19585
[1986/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0193260
Date:03.09.1986
Language:EN
[1986/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0193260
Date:13.05.1987
Language:EN
[1987/20]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.03.1987
ClassificationIPC:C07D407/04, A61K31/35, // C07C177/00, A61K31/557
[1986/36]
CPC:
C07D407/04 (EP,US); A61P11/08 (EP); A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P7/02 (EP); A61P9/12 (EP); A61P9/14 (EP)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1986/36]
TitleGerman:Prostacyclin-Derivate[1986/36]
English:Prostacyclin derivatives[1986/36]
French:Dérivés de prostacycline[1986/36]
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure21.10.1987Examination requested  [1987/52]
05.09.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.03.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.03.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.07.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.10.1991Fee for grant paid
04.10.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
01.08.1992Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1993/05]
07.09.1992Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [1993/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
12.01.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
16.01.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
24.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 06
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.01.199207   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2449085  (UPJOHN CO [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.