Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0206448

EP0206448 - Hemoglobin combined with a poly(alkylene oxide) [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.09.1991
Database last updated on 24.08.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip14.09.1991No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.11.1991 [1991/45]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AJINOMOTO CO., INC.
5-8, Kyobashi 1-chome, Chuo-ku
Tokyo 104 / JP
[1986/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Iwasaki, Keiji
No. 2-89, SHinmei-cho Saiwai-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP
02 / Iwashita, Yuji
No. 581-1-1212, Ichinotsubo Nakaharu-ku
Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP
03 / Okami, Taketoshi
No. 57-33, Honmura-cho Asahi-ku
Yokohama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP
[1986/52]
Representative(s)Bond, Bentley George , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co., Imperial House, 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UD / GB
[N/P]
Former [1986/52]Bond, Bentley George , et al
Haseltine Lake & Co. 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane
London WC2A 1AT / GB
Application number, filing date86301108.618.02.1986
[1986/52]
Priority number, dateJP1985013205619.06.1985         Original published format: JP 13205685
[1986/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0206448
Date:30.12.1986
Language:EN
[1986/52]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0206448
Date:14.11.1990
Language:EN
[1990/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.10.1986
ClassificationInternational:C07K15/22, C08G65/32, A61K37/14
[1986/52]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   GB,   IT,   LI [1986/52]
TitleGerman:Hämoglobin, das an ein Poly(alkenylenoxid) gebunden ist[1986/52]
English:Hemoglobin combined with a poly(alkylene oxide)[1986/52]
French:Hémoglobine liée à un poly(oxyde d'alkylène)[1986/52]
Examination procedure09.06.1987Examination requested  [1987/32]
25.04.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.09.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
20.10.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
06.06.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.07.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
24.01.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.02.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02)
26.02.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
08.05.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.06.1990Fee for grant paid
28.06.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.08.1991No opposition filed within time limit [1991/45]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.02.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
09.02.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
12.02.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:SearchEP0067029  [ ];
 FR2551660  [ ]
    [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, C field, vol. 8, no. 199, September 12, 1984 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 63 C 242 * JP-A 59 89 629 (AJINOMOTO K.K.) *
    [ ] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, unexamined applications, C field, vol. 8, no. 218, October 4, 1984 THE PATENT OFFICE JAPANESE GOVERNMENT page 134 C 245 * JP-A 59 104 3234 (AJINOMOTO K.K.) *
ExaminationUS3941710
    - Patent Abstracts of Japan, unexamined applications, C field , vol.8, no. 218, 04 Oct. 1984 THE PAT. OFFICE JAP. GOVERNM., page 134 C 245