blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0193382

EP0193382 - Optical fiber cables having improved hermeticity [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  21.01.1992
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OLIN CORPORATION
427 North Shamrock Street East Alton
Illinois 62024 / US
[N/P]
Former [1986/36]For all designated states
Olin Corporation
427 North Shamrock Street
East Alton Illinois 62024 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Smith, Warren F., Jr.
73 Pine Orchard Road
Branford Connecticut 06405 / US
02 / Shapiro, Eugene
926 Ridge Road
Hamden Connecticut 06517 / US
03 / Winter, Joseph
88 Vista Terrace
New Haven Connecticut 06515 / US
[1986/36]
Representative(s)Lambert, Hugh Richmond, et al
D. YOUNG & CO., 21 New Fetter Lane
London EC4A 1DA / GB
[1986/36]
Application number, filing date86301347.025.02.1986
[1986/36]
Priority number, dateUS1985070524625.02.1985         Original published format: US 705246
[1986/36]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0193382
Date:03.09.1986
Language:EN
[1986/36]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0193382
Date:05.10.1988
Language:EN
[1988/40]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP17.08.1988
ClassificationIPC:G02B6/44
[1986/36]
CPC:
G02B6/4488 (EP,US); G02B6/44 (KR); G02B6/4427 (EP,US);
Y10T29/49888 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1986/36]
TitleGerman:Faseroptische dichte Kabel[1986/36]
English:Optical fiber cables having improved hermeticity[1986/36]
French:Câbles à fibre optique étanche[1986/36]
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Examination procedure18.03.1989Examination requested  [1989/20]
03.09.1991Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1992/11]
27.09.1991Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time  [1992/11]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.08.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
07.01.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
04.01.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
29.02.198803   M06   Fee paid on   11.08.1988
28.02.199106   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JP5734504  ;
 [A]US4437729  (PARFREE COLIN S [GB], et al);
 [A]US4446686  (PANUSKA ANDREW J [US], et al);
 [A]US4477147  (WINTER JOSEPH [US], et al);
 [A]US4479702  (PRYOR MICHAEL J [US], et al)
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 100 (P-121)[978], 9th June 1982; & JP-A-57 34 504 (FURUKAWA DENKI KOGYO K.K.) 24-02-1982, & JP5734504 A 00000000
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.