EP0235417 - Inorganic mineral composition [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.09.1993 Database last updated on 22.04.2025 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 26.12.2007 [2007/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Jensen, Charles Allen 401 East California Boulevard Pasadena California 91160 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1987/37] | For all designated states Jensen, Charles Allen 401 East California Boulevard Pasadena California 91160 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1987/37] | Representative(s) | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1987/37] | Goldin, Douglas Michael, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14, South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 86301421.3 | 27.02.1986 | [1987/37] | Priority number, date | US19860822532 | 27.01.1986 Original published format: US 822532 | [1987/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0235417 | Date: | 09.09.1987 | Language: | EN | [1987/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0235417 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.06.1987 | Classification | IPC: | A61K35/02, A61K33/26 | [1987/37] | CPC: |
A61K33/26 (EP,US);
A61K35/02 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1987/37] | Title | German: | Anorganische Mineralzusammensetzung | [1987/37] | English: | Inorganic mineral composition | [1987/37] | French: | Composition inorganique d'un minéral | [1987/37] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 01.03.1988 | Examination requested [1988/17] | 24.07.1989 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.05.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.11.1990 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.07.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 25.02.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination {1} | 05.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/45] | Request for further processing for: | 16.04.1992 | Request for further processing filed | 16.04.1992 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 05.05.1992 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1988 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.02.1989 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.02.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 02.03.1992 | 07   M06   Fee paid on   28.08.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 19.11.1992 | BE | 19.11.1992 | CH | 19.11.1992 | DE | 19.11.1992 | FR | 19.11.1992 | IT | 19.11.1992 | LI | 19.11.1992 | NL | 19.11.1992 | SE | 19.11.1992 | GB | 27.02.1993 | LU | 28.02.1993 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 19.11.1992 | |
BE | 19.11.1992 | ||
CH | 19.11.1992 | ||
DE | 19.11.1992 | ||
IT | 19.11.1992 | ||
LI | 19.11.1992 | ||
NL | 19.11.1992 | ||
SE | 19.11.1992 | ||
GB | 27.02.1993 | ||
LU | 28.02.1993 | ||
FR | 09.04.1993 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 19.11.1992 | |
BE | 19.11.1992 | ||
CH | 19.11.1992 | ||
DE | 19.11.1992 | ||
IT | 19.11.1992 | ||
LI | 19.11.1992 | ||
NL | 19.11.1992 | ||
SE | 19.11.1992 | ||
GB | 27.02.1993 | ||
FR | 09.04.1993 | ||
Former [1994/18] | AT | 19.11.1992 | |
BE | 19.11.1992 | ||
CH | 19.11.1992 | ||
DE | 19.11.1992 | ||
LI | 19.11.1992 | ||
NL | 19.11.1992 | ||
SE | 19.11.1992 | ||
GB | 27.02.1993 | ||
FR | 09.04.1993 | ||
Former [1994/02] | BE | 19.11.1992 | |
CH | 19.11.1992 | ||
DE | 19.11.1992 | ||
LI | 19.11.1992 | ||
NL | 19.11.1992 | ||
SE | 19.11.1992 | ||
GB | 27.02.1993 | ||
FR | 09.04.1993 | ||
Former [1993/48] | BE | 19.11.1992 | |
CH | 19.11.1992 | ||
DE | 19.11.1992 | ||
LI | 19.11.1992 | ||
NL | 19.11.1992 | ||
SE | 19.11.1992 | ||
FR | 09.04.1993 | ||
Former [1993/33] | BE | 19.11.1992 | |
CH | 19.11.1992 | ||
DE | 19.11.1992 | ||
LI | 19.11.1992 | ||
NL | 19.11.1992 | ||
SE | 19.11.1992 | ||
Former [1993/28] | CH | 19.11.1992 | |
DE | 19.11.1992 | ||
LI | 19.11.1992 | ||
NL | 19.11.1992 | ||
SE | 19.11.1992 | ||
Former [1993/26] | CH | 19.11.1992 | |
LI | 19.11.1992 | ||
NL | 19.11.1992 | ||
SE | 19.11.1992 | ||
Former [1993/23] | CH | 19.11.1992 | |
LI | 19.11.1992 | ||
NL | 19.11.1992 | ||
Former [1993/21] | CH | 19.11.1992 | |
LI | 19.11.1992 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2336938 (SATO MASATARO [JP]); | [A]EP0061175 (KYOWA CHEM IND CO LTD [JP]) |