Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0196210 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0196210



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 473
03.07.2008 CDS Clean up - amended opponent data Opposition 1
08.07.1999 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
10.12.1998 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
10.12.1998 Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form Opposition 1
17.10.1998 Filing of the translation of the amended claims Opposition 1
17.10.1998 French translation of claims Opposition 1
17.10.1998 German translation of the claims Opposition 2
18.08.1998 Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations Opposition 4
18.08.1998 Text intended for grant Opposition 13
11.08.1998 Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision Opposition 1
21.07.1998 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
21.07.1998 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
28.01.1998 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
28.01.1998 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
19.01.1998 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
19.01.1998 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
17.12.1997 Claims Appeal 2
17.12.1997 Claims Appeal 2
17.12.1997 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 18
17.12.1997 F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) Appeal 3
17.12.1997 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
08.12.1997 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 2
08.12.1997 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 2
24.11.1997 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
19.11.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
01.09.1997 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
01.09.1997 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
01.09.1997 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
27.08.1997 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
20.08.1997 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
20.08.1997 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
18.08.1997 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
11.08.1997 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
06.08.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
31.07.1997 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
31.07.1997 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
31.07.1997 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
30.07.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
29.07.1997 Communication (no form) Appeal 2
29.07.1997 Communication (no form) Appeal 2
28.07.1997 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
25.07.1997 Communication (no form) Appeal 2
25.07.1997 Communication (no form) Appeal 2
23.07.1997 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 3
23.07.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
23.07.1997 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 9
22.07.1997 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
22.07.1997 Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
18.07.1997 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
18.07.1997 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 2
11.07.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
18.01.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
14.01.1997 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
26.07.1996 Communication (no form) Appeal 2
16.07.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
05.01.1995 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
24.12.1994 Claims Appeal 2
24.12.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 3
20.10.1994 Request for extension of time limit Appeal 1
24.06.1994 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
21.06.1994 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
17.06.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 4
17.06.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
17.06.1994 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 1
03.06.1994 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
03.06.1994 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
24.05.1994 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
24.05.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 6
24.05.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
24.05.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 2
24.05.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
24.05.1994 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 3
24.05.1994 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
24.05.1994 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 1
18.05.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
10.05.1994 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
09.05.1994 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
03.05.1994 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
03.05.1994 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
03.05.1994 Claims Opposition 1
03.05.1994 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
03.05.1994 Decision rejecting the opposition Opposition 1
03.05.1994 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 3
03.05.1994 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 15
03.05.1994 Means of redress Opposition 1
03.05.1994 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
21.04.1994 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
07.04.1994 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.03.1994 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
26.03.1994 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
24.11.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
18.11.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
08.11.1993 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
08.11.1993 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Erhardtstrasse 27) Opposition 1
28.10.1993 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
25.10.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
25.10.1993 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
19.10.1993 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
15.10.1993 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
13.10.1993 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
13.10.1993 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.10.1993 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
23.08.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
13.08.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
01.07.1993 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
21.06.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
18.06.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
11.06.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 3
11.06.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 2
09.06.1993 Brief communication with time limit Opposition 1
01.06.1993 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 1
01.06.1993 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
28.04.1993 Annex to the communication Opposition 1
28.04.1993 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
06.04.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.03.1993 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
29.03.1993 Reply to an examination report in opposition proceedings Opposition 2
10.02.1993 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
06.02.1993 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
03.02.1993 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
13.10.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
05.10.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
24.09.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
16.09.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
10.09.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
02.09.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
02.09.1992 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
31.08.1992 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
26.08.1992 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
17.08.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.08.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
29.07.1992 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
29.07.1992 Communication inviting the parties to file observations Opposition 2
21.04.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
14.04.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
07.04.1992 Claims Opposition 2
07.04.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
30.01.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
11.01.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
09.01.1992 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
06.12.1991 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
26.11.1991 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 2
11.11.1991 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
06.11.1991 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
04.11.1991 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 6
26.08.1991 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
21.08.1991 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
16.08.1991 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
23.04.1991 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
15.04.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
12.04.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
04.04.1991 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
04.04.1991 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
12.02.1991 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
12.02.1991 Annex to a communication Opposition 5
12.02.1991 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
12.02.1991 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
12.02.1991 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
13.06.1990 Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC Search / examination 1
23.04.1990 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
03.04.1990 Decision to allow further processing Search / examination 1
06.03.1990 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
06.03.1990 French translation of claims Search / examination 1
06.03.1990 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
26.02.1990 Application deemed to be withdrawn (translations of claims/payment missing) Search / examination 1
06.10.1989 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
28.09.1989 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
11.08.1989 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
11.08.1989 Text intended for grant Search / examination 32
19.07.1989 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
16.02.1989 Claims Search / examination 2
16.02.1989 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
14.10.1988 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
10.06.1987 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
13.04.1987 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
13.04.1987 European search report Search / examination 2
10.02.1987 Communication of expected date of establishment of search report Search / examination 1
15.01.1987 General enquiry Search / examination 1
20.08.1986 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
20.05.1986 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.05.1986 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.05.1986 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.05.1986 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
20.05.1986 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
15.04.1986 Authorisation Search / examination 1
15.04.1986 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
24.03.1986 Abstract Search / examination 1
24.03.1986 Claims Search / examination 3
24.03.1986 Description Search / examination 23
24.03.1986 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
24.03.1986 Priority document Search / examination 30
24.03.1986 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10
24.03.1986 Translation of priority document Search / examination 26