Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0202780

EP0202780 - Flocculation processes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  23.10.1998
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ciba Specialty Chemicals Water Treatments Limited
P.O. Box 38, Low Moor Bradford
West Yorkshire BD12 0JZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1986/48]For all designated states
ALLIED COLLOIDS LIMITED
P.O. Box 38, Low Moor
Bradford, West Yorkshire BD12 0JZ / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Flesher, Peter
Little Beck Beck Lane
Bingley West Yorkshire / GB
02 / Farrar, David
13 Green Field Lane Idle
Bradford West Yorkshire / GB
03 / Field, John Rodney
2 Leyburn Avenue Hipperholme
Halifax West Yorkshire / GB
[1986/48]
Representative(s)Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton , et al
Gill Jennings & Every LLP Broadgate House 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
[N/P]
Former [1986/48]Lawrence, Peter Robin Broughton , et al
GILL JENNINGS & EVERY, Broadgate House, 7 Eldon Street
London EC2M 7LH / GB
Application number, filing date86302987.221.04.1986
[1986/48]
Priority number, dateGB1985001049625.04.1985         Original published format: GB 8510496
GB1985002662429.10.1985         Original published format: GB 8526624
[1986/48]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0202780
Date:26.11.1986
Language:EN
[1986/48]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0202780
Date:21.10.1987
Language:EN
[1987/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0202780
Date:02.11.1989
Language:EN
[1989/44]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0202780
Date:09.12.1998
Language:EN
[1998/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.09.1987
ClassificationInternational:C02F1/56
[1986/48]
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1986/48]
TitleGerman:Flockungsverfahren[1986/48]
English:Flocculation processes[1986/48]
French:Procédés de floculation[1986/48]
Examination procedure10.09.1987Examination requested  [1987/45]
06.04.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.04.1989Fee for grant paid
13.04.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
25.04.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  02.08.1990  05.11.1990  ADMISSIBLE
SNF Floerger
41, Rue Jean-Huss
F-42028 Saint-Etienne Cedex / FR
Opponent's representative
Maiwald, Walter
Maiwald Patentanwalts- und
Rechtsanwaltsgesellschaft mbH
Elisenhof
Elisenstraße 3
80335 München / DE
 02  24.02.1993  26.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Cyanamid of Great Britain Limited
Bowling Park Drive
Bradford, West Yorkshire / GB
Opponent's representative
Allam, Peter Clerk
Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street
London WC1A 1LW / GB
 03  06.11.1993   
Chemische Fabrik Stockhausen GmbH Patentabteilung
Bäkerpfad 25
D-47705 Krefeld / DE
Opponent's representative
Klöpsch, Gerald
Boehmert & Boehmert
Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB
Pettenkoferstrasse 22
80336 München / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1994/33]
Opponent(s)01  02.08.1990  05.11.1990  ADMISSIBLE
SNF Floerger
41, Rue Jean-Huss
F-42028 Saint-Etienne Cedex / FR
Opponent's representative
Maiwald, Walter, Dr. Dipl.-Chem.
Maiwald & Partner, Poccistrasse 11
D-80336 München / DE
 02  24.02.1993  26.03.1993  ADMISSIBLE
Cyanamid of Great Britain Limited
Bowling Park Drive
Bradford, West Yorkshire / GB
Opponent's representative
Allam, Peter Clerk
LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand
London WC2R 0AE / GB
 03  06.11.1993   
Chemische Fabrik Stockhausen GmbH Patentabteilung
Bäkerpfad 25
D-47705 Krefeld / DE
Opponent's representative
Klöpsch, Gerald, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwalt
An Gross St. Martin 6
D-50667 Köln / DE
Former [1994/02]
Opponent(s)01  02.08.1990   
SNF Floerger
41, Rue Jean-Huss
F-42028 Saint-Etienne Cedex / FR
Opponent's representative
Maiwald, Walter, Dr.
Maiwald & Partner, Postfach 15 13 09
D-80337 München / DE
 02  24.02.1993   
Cyanamid of Great Britain Limited
Bowling Park Drive
Bradford, West Yorkshire / GB
Opponent's representative
Allam, Peter Clerk
LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand
London WC2R 0AE / GB
 03  06.11.1993   
Chemische Fabrik Stockhausen GmbH Patentabteilung
Bäkerpfad 25
D-47705 Krefeld / DE
Opponent's representative
Klöpsch, Gerald, Dr.-Ing. Patentanwalt
An Gross St. Martin 6
D-50667 Köln / DE
Former [1993/17]
Opponent(s)01  02.08.1990   
SNF Floerger
41, Rue Jean-Huss
F-42028 Saint-Etienne Cedex / FR
Opponent's representative
Maiwald, Walter, Dr.
Maiwald & Partner, Postfach 15 13 09
D-80337 München / DE
 02  24.02.1993   
Cyanamid of Great Britain Limited
Bowling Park Drive
Bradford, West Yorkshire / GB
Opponent's representative
Allam, Peter Clerk
LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand
London WC2R 0AE / GB
Former [1990/40]
Opponent(s)01  02.08.1990   
SNF Floerger
41, Rue Jean-Huss
F-42028 Saint-Etienne Cedex / FR
Opponent's representative
Maiwald, Walter, Dr.
Maiwald & Partner, Postfach 15 13 09
D-80337 München / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
13.09.1990No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
30.10.1990No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
07.11.1990Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.03.1991Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
02.12.1991Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
20.06.1995Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
13.10.1995Reply to a communication from the opposition division
21.11.1995Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
16.04.1996Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
13.06.1996Reply to a communication from the opposition division
19.01.1998Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
11.03.1998Reply to a communication from the opposition division
08.04.1998Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
18.04.1998Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
17.07.1998Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
30.09.1998Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition12.02.1992Appeal received No.  T0169/92
13.04.1992Statement of grounds filed
15.10.1993Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1993/42]
15.12.1993Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1993/51]
12.07.1994Result of appeal procedure: continuation of opposition procedure
21.04.1994Date of oral proceedings
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.04.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
11.04.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB23.01.1995
[1995/37]
Documents cited:Search[A]US3977971  ;
 [A]DE2700654  ;
 [A]GB1579007
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 92, no. 18, 5th May 1980, page 140, abstract no. 149150f, Columbus, Ohio, US; R.J. AKERS et al.: "An experimental study of the effect of shear on flocs", & WORLD FILTR. CONGR., ÄPREPR.Ü, 2nd 1979, 365-75