blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0199603

EP0199603 - System for performing high speed video animation [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1986/44]Method and apparatus for performing high speed video animation
[1993/26]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  28.12.1994
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AMPEX CORPORATION
401 Broadway M.S. 3-35 Redwood City
California 94063-3199 / US
[N/P]
Former [1986/44]For all designated states
AMPEX CORPORATION
401 Broadway M.S. 3-35
Redwood City California 94063-3199 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Little, Graeme M.
1485 Enderby Way
Sunnyvale State of California / US
[1986/44]
Representative(s)Horton, Andrew Robert Grant, et al
Bowles Horton
Felden House
Dower Mews
High Street
Berkhamsted, Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1986/44]Horton, Andrew Robert Grant, et al
BOWLES HORTON Felden House Dower Mews High Street
Berkhamsted Hertfordshire HP4 2BL / GB
Application number, filing date86303154.825.04.1986
[1986/44]
Priority number, dateUS1985072745526.04.1985         Original published format: US 727455
[1986/44]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0199603
Date:29.10.1986
Language:EN
[1986/44]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0199603
Date:20.01.1988
Language:EN
[1988/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0199603
Date:30.06.1993
Language:EN
[1993/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.11.1987
ClassificationIPC:G11B27/02, // H04N5/782
[1986/44]
CPC:
G11B27/028 (EP,US); G11B27/34 (EP,US); G11B2220/90 (EP,US);
G11B27/024 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1993/24]
Former [1986/44]AT,  CH,  DE,  FR,  GB,  LI,  NL 
TitleGerman:System zur Ausführung einer sehr schnellen Videoanimierung[1993/26]
English:System for performing high speed video animation[1993/26]
French:Système pour réaliser une animation vidéo à grande vitesse[1993/26]
Former [1986/44]Verfahren und Gerät zur Ausführung einer sehr schnellen Videoanimierung
Former [1986/44]Method and apparatus for performing high speed video animation
Former [1986/44]Procédé et appareil pour réaliser une animation vidéo à grande vitesse
Examination procedure28.05.1988Examination requested  [1988/31]
07.10.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
04.03.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.05.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
19.09.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.10.1989Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
29.09.1992Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
06.10.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.11.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.12.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.02.1993Fee for grant paid
03.02.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination21.12.1989Appeal received No.  T0253/90
09.03.1990Statement of grounds filed
13.06.1990Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1990/24]
20.08.1990Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1990/34]
16.10.1990Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1990/42]
24.12.1990Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1990/52]
25.07.1991Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M06) [1991/30]
31.01.1992Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1992/05]
24.03.1992Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1992/13]
25.04.1992Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1992/17]
05.06.1992Invitation to file observations in an appeal (Time limit: M02) [1992/23]
03.08.1992Date of receipt of observations in an appeal [1992/32]
04.09.1992Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
12.04.1991Date of oral proceedings
19.04.1991Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  26.03.1994  04.05.1994  ADMISSIBLE
BTS Broadcast Television Systems GmbH
Robert-Bosch-Str. 7, Postfach 110261
64293 Darmstadt / DE
Opponent's representative
von Laue, Hanns-Ulrich
Philips Intellectual Property & Standards GmbH
Postfach 50 04 42
52088 Aachen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1994/29]
Opponent(s)01  26.03.1994  04.05.1994  ADMISSIBLE
BTS Broadcast Television Systems GmbH
Robert-Bosch-Str. 7, Postfach 110261
64293 Darmstadt / DE
Opponent's representative
von Laue, Hanns-Ulrich, Dipl.-Ing.
Philips Patentverwaltung GmbH, Röntgenstrasse 24
D-22335 Hamburg / DE
Former [1994/21]
Opponent(s)01  26.03.1994   
BTS Broadcast Television Systems GmbH
Robert-Bosch-Str. 7, Postfach 110261
64293 Darmstadt / DE
09.05.1994Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
12.09.1994Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
22.09.1994Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
02.10.1994Legal effect of revocation of patent [1995/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
15.04.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
11.04.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
17.04.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
21.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 06
10.04.1992Renewal fee patent year 07
13.04.1993Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGB25.04.1994
[1995/19]
Documents cited:Search[X]US4213163  (LEMELSON JEROME H [US]);
 [A]DE2945615  (SIEMENS AG [DE]);
 [A]EP0038167  (SONY CORP [JP]);
 [A]EP0083958  (SONY CORP [JP])
ExaminationUS3051777
    - Journal of the Audio Engineering Society, vol. 32, no. 3, 1984, March, pp. 114-121
    - Fernseh- und Kinotechnik, 1974, no. 2, pp. 33-36
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.