blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0206479

EP0206479 - Portable fire escape [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  18.04.1991
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.04.1991Application deemed to be withdrawnpublished on 05.06.1991 [1991/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Baker, Ralph T.
Pyles Lane New Castle
Delaware 19720 / US
[N/P]
Former [1986/52]For all designated states
Baker, Ralph T.
Pyles Lane
New Castle Delaware 19720 / US
Inventor(s)01 / see applicant
...
[1986/52]
Representative(s)Corin, Christopher John, et al
Mathisen Macara & Co. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road Ickenham
Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB
[N/P]
Former [1986/52]Corin, Christopher John, et al
Mathisen Macara & Co. The Coach House 6-8 Swakeleys Road
Ickenham Uxbridge UB10 8BZ / GB
Application number, filing date86303412.006.05.1986
[1986/52]
Priority number, dateUS1985074019924.05.1985         Original published format: US 740199
[1986/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0206479
Date:30.12.1986
Language:EN
[1986/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0206479
Date:20.05.1987
Language:EN
[1987/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.03.1987
ClassificationIPC:A62B1/20
[1986/52]
CPC:
A62B1/20 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1986/52]
TitleGerman:Tragbare Fluchtvorrichtung[1986/52]
English:Portable fire escape[1986/52]
French:Appareil de sauvetage portatif[1986/52]
File destroyed:02.03.1998
Examination procedure21.10.1987Examination requested  [1988/01]
02.06.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
14.08.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
28.08.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.12.1990Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1991/23]
11.01.1991Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [1991/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.05.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
16.05.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
30.05.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB1142060  (ALFRED BULLEN);
 [Y]US4398621  (BAKER RALPH T [US]);
 [XP]US4583616  (BAKER RALPH T [US])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.