Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0206661

EP0206661 - A semiconductor laser apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  05.07.1996
Database last updated on 18.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Sharp Kabushiki Kaisha
22-22 Nagaike-cho
Abeno-ku
Osaka-shi
Osaka-fu 545-0013 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1986/52]For all designated states
SHARP KABUSHIKI KAISHA
22-22 Nagaike-cho Abeno-ku
Osaka 545 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yamamoto, Osamu
1-25-8, Shichijo-nishimachi
Nara-shi Nara-ken / JP
02 / Hayashi, Hiroshi
5-8, 11-chome, Nagamodai Kamo-cho
Soraku-gun Kyoto / JP
03 / Yamamoto, Saburo
1-2-11, Akanedai Haibara-cho
Uda-gun Nara-ken / JP
[1986/52]
Representative(s)Jones, Colin , et al
W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Coopers Building Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
[N/P]
Former [1986/52]Jones, Colin , et al
W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Coopers Building Church Street
Liverpool L1 3AB / GB
Application number, filing date86304512.612.06.1986
[1986/52]
Priority number, dateJP1985013055914.06.1985         Original published format: JP 13055985
[1986/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0206661
Date:30.12.1986
Language:EN
[1986/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0206661
Date:20.01.1988
Language:EN
[1988/03]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0206661
Date:30.08.1995
Language:EN
[1995/35]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP01.12.1987
ClassificationInternational:H01S3/085, H01S3/025, H01S3/133, H01L31/14
[1995/35]
Former International [1986/52]H01S3/08, H01S3/02, H01S3/133, H01L31/14
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   NL [1986/52]
TitleGerman:Halbleiterlaservorrichtung[1986/52]
English:A semiconductor laser apparatus[1986/52]
French:Dispositif laser à semi-conducteur[1986/52]
Examination procedure19.06.1986Examination requested  [1986/52]
06.12.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
02.04.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.06.1992Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1}
22.12.1994Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.03.1995Communication of intention to grant the patent
06.05.1995Fee for grant paid
06.05.1995Fee for publishing/printing paid
Appeal following examination25.08.1992Appeal received No.  T1032/92
22.10.1992Statement of grounds filed
23.08.1994Result of appeal procedure: continuation of examination procedure
Opposition(s)31.05.1996No opposition filed within time limit [1996/34]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.06.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
17.06.1991Renewal fee patent year 06
09.06.1992Renewal fee patent year 07
14.06.1993Renewal fee patent year 08
11.06.1994Renewal fee patent year 09
01.05.1995Renewal fee patent year 10
Documents cited:Search[A]JP5414180  ;
 [A]JP58111391  ;
 [A]EP0090485  ;
 [A]FR2301114  ;
 [A]DE3017509  ;
 [XP]DE3442188
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 3, no. 36 (E-100), 27th March 1979; & JP-A-54 14 180 (CANON K.K.) 02-02-1979, & JP5414180 A 00000000
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 7, no. 218 (E-200)[1363], 28th September 1983; & JP-A-58 111 391 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 02-07-1983, & JP58111391 A 00000000