blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0206727

EP0206727 - Production of mechanically alloyed powder [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  17.06.1994
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.08.1994Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): NL
published on 28.09.1994 [1994/39]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Inco Alloys International, Inc.
Huntington
West Virginia 25720 / US
[N/P]
Former [1986/52]For all designated states
Inco Alloys International, Inc.
Huntington West Virginia 25720 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Gilman, Paul Sandford
5 Marget Ann Lane
Suffern New York, 10901 / US
02 / Mattson, Walter Ernest
38 Eisenhower Drive
West Milford N. Jersey, 07480 / US
[1986/52]
Representative(s)Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew
Kilburn & Strode LLP
Lancon London
84 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8NL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1986/52]Hedley, Nicholas James Matthew
Stephenson Harwood One, St. Paul's Churchyard
London EC4M 8SH / GB
Application number, filing date86304644.716.06.1986
[1986/52]
Priority number, dateUS1985074589018.06.1985         Original published format: US 745890
[1986/52]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0206727
Date:30.12.1986
Language:EN
[1986/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0206727
Date:18.03.1987
Language:EN
[1987/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0206727
Date:17.10.1990
Language:EN
[1990/42]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0206727
Date:03.08.1994
Language:EN
[1994/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP27.01.1987
ClassificationIPC:B22F9/04
[1986/52]
CPC:
B22F9/04 (EP,US); B22F2009/041 (EP,US); B22F2009/043 (EP,US);
Y10S241/14 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1986/52]
TitleGerman:Herstellung von mechanisch legierten Pulvern[1986/52]
English:Production of mechanically alloyed powder[1986/52]
French:Fabrication de poudres par alliage mécanique[1986/52]
Examination procedure04.10.1986Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims
05.11.1986Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1}
14.09.1987Examination requested  [1987/45]
27.12.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.07.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.10.1989Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time
27.12.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.04.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.06.1990Fee for grant paid
25.06.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.07.1991  05.08.1991  ADMISSIBLE
Eckart-Werke Standard Bronzepulver-Werke Carl Eckart GmbH & Co.
Kaiserstrasse 30
D-90763 Fürth / DE
Opponent's representative
Louis Pöhlau Lohrentz
Patentanwälte
Postfach 30 55
90014 Nürnberg / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1991/37]
Opponent(s)01  16.07.1991  05.08.1991  ADMISSIBLE
Eckart-Werke Standard Bronzepulver-Werke Carl Eckart GmbH & Co.
Kaiserstrasse 30
D-90763 Fürth / DE
Opponent's representative
LOUIS, PÖHLAU, LOHRENTZ & SEGETH
Postfach 3055
D-90014 Nürnberg / DE
23.08.1991Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
10.01.1992Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
17.01.1992Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M04)
02.04.1993Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M04)
20.07.1993Reply to a communication from the opposition division
30.11.1993Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
11.12.1993Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
16.03.1994Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
03.05.1994Fee for printing new specification paid
Request for further processing for:26.10.1989Request for further processing filed
20.10.1989Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
21.11.1989Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.06.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
20.06.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
25.06.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE17.06.1993
CH30.06.1993
LI30.06.1993
NL01.01.1994
[1994/39]
Former [1994/18]SE17.06.1993
CH30.06.1993
LI30.06.1993
Former [1994/16]SE17.06.1993
Documents cited:Search[A]DE1286702  (DEUTSCHE EDELSTAHLWERKE AG);
 [A]US3597188  (NEUMANN NATHAN);
 [A]DE2438841  (USS ENG & CONSULT);
 [Y]EP0130034  (MPD TECHNOLOGY [US])
 [X]  - E. KLAR: "Metals handbook", 9th edition, "Powder metallurgy", vol. 7, 1984, pages 56-65, American Society for Metals, Ohio, US
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.