Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0208484

EP0208484 - Control circuit for an ink jet head [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  14.01.1993
Database last updated on 18.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip17.02.2006Change - lapse in a contracting state
Updated state(s): FR
published on 05.04.2006  [2006/14]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Ing. C. Olivetti & C., S.p.A.
Via G. Jervis 77
10015 Ivrea / IT
[N/P]
Former [1987/03]For all designated states
Ing. C. Olivetti & C., S.p.A.
Via G. Jervis 77
I-10015 Ivrea / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Scardovi, Alessandro
Via Burzio 1
I-10015 Ivrea (Turin) / IT
[1987/03]
Representative(s)Pears, David Ashley , et al
REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road
London WC1X 8PL / GB
[1987/03]
Application number, filing date86305013.427.06.1986
[1987/03]
Priority number, dateIT1985006760101.07.1985         Original published format: IT 6760185
[1987/03]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0208484
Date:14.01.1987
Language:EN
[1987/03]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0208484
Date:20.07.1988
Language:EN
[1988/29]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0208484
Date:11.03.1992
Language:EN
[1992/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP31.05.1988
ClassificationInternational:B41J2/055
[1992/11]
Former International [1988/29]B41J3/04
Former International [1987/03]H04N1/032
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   LI,   NL,   SE [1987/03]
TitleGerman:Steuerschaltung für einen Tintenstrahlkopf[1987/03]
English:Control circuit for an ink jet head[1987/03]
French:Circuit de commande pour une tête de jet d'encre[1987/03]
Examination procedure06.12.1988Examination requested  [1989/05]
18.05.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
19.09.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.11.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.03.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.06.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.09.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
11.11.1991Fee for grant paid
11.11.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.12.1992No opposition filed within time limit [1993/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.06.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
12.06.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
12.06.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
17.06.1991Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipCH11.03.1992
FR11.03.1992
LI11.03.1992
NL11.03.1992
SE11.03.1992
[2006/14]
Former [1993/10]CH11.03.1992
LI11.03.1992
NL11.03.1992
SE11.03.1992
FR31.07.1992
Former [1992/48]CH11.03.1992
LI11.03.1992
NL11.03.1992
SE11.03.1992
Former [1992/47]CH11.03.1992
LI11.03.1992
SE11.03.1992
Former [1992/37]CH11.03.1992
LI11.03.1992
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2029329  (HELL R GMBH);
 [A]EP0090669  (HONEYWELL INC [US])
ExaminationEP0099683