Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0209358

EP0209358 - Radiation image storage panel [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  27.07.1991
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip12.09.1991Lapse of the patent in a contracting statepublished on 30.10.1991 [1991/44]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KONICA CORPORATION
26-2, Nishishinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1987/04]For all designated states
KONICA CORPORATION
26-2, Nishi-shinjuku 1-chome Shinjuku-ku
Tokyo 163 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Kano, Akiko
Konishiroku Photo Industry Co. Ltd.
1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi Tokyo / JP
02 / Tsuchino, Hisanori
Konishiroku Photo Industry Co. Ltd.
1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi Tokyo / JP
03 / Amitani, Koji
Konishiroku Photo Industry Co. Ltd.
1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi Tokyo / JP
04 / Shimada, Fumio
Konishiroku Photo Industry Co. Ltd.
1 Sakura-machi Hino-shi Tokyo / JP
[1987/04]
Representative(s)Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
[N/P]
Former [1987/04]Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine , et al
J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn
London WC1R 5LX / GB
Application number, filing date86305438.315.07.1986
[1987/04]
Priority number, dateJP1985015634615.07.1985         Original published format: JP 15634685
[1987/04]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0209358
Date:21.01.1987
Language:EN
[1987/04]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0209358
Date:07.10.1987
Language:EN
[1987/41]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0209358
Date:26.09.1990
Language:EN
[1990/39]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP19.08.1987
ClassificationInternational:G21K4/00
[1987/04]
Designated contracting statesDE,   GB,   NL [1987/04]
TitleGerman:Schirm zum Speichern eines Strahlungsbildes[1987/04]
English:Radiation image storage panel[1987/04]
French:Ecran pour l'enregistrement d'une image obtenue par rayonnement[1987/04]
Examination procedure07.03.1988Examination requested  [1988/18]
29.09.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
09.02.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
22.02.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
21.05.1990Fee for grant paid
21.05.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.06.1991No opposition filed within time limit [1991/38]
Fees paidRenewal fee
13.07.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
10.07.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
17.07.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipNL26.09.1990
[1991/44]
Documents cited:Search[A]EP0126218