Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0213759

EP0213759 - Valve operating mechanism [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  28.01.1993
Database last updated on 22.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip28.01.1993No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 17.03.1993 [1993/11]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-go, 1-ban, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome Minato-ku
Tokyo 107 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1987/11]For all designated states
HONDA GIKEN KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1-go, 1-ban, Minami-Aoyama 2-chome
Minato-ku Tokyo 107 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nagahiro, Kenichi
480-7, Oaza-Kishi
Kawagoe-shi Saitama / JP
02 / Inoue, Kazuo
3-6-1, Takanodai Nerima-ku
Tokyo / JP
03 / Ajiki, Yoshio
2-3-6, Hatanaka
Niiza-shi Saitama / JP
04 / Katoh, Masaaki
162-118, Sunakubo
Kawagoe-shi Saitama / JP
[1987/11]
Representative(s)Leale, Robin George , et al
Frank B. Dehn & Co.,European Patent Attorneys, 179 Queen Victoria Street
London EC4V 4EL / GB
[N/P]
Former [1987/11]Leale, Robin George , et al
FRANK B. DEHN & CO. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway
London WC2B 6UZ / GB
Application number, filing date86305916.831.07.1986
[1987/11]
Priority number, dateJP1985016871731.07.1985         Original published format: JP 16871785
[1987/11]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0213759
Date:11.03.1987
Language:EN
[1987/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0213759
Date:25.03.1992
Language:EN
[1992/13]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.12.1986
ClassificationInternational:F01L31/22, F01L13/00, F01L1/26
[1987/11]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1987/11]
TitleGerman:Ventilantriebsmechanismus[1987/11]
English:Valve operating mechanism[1987/11]
French:Mécanisme de fonctionnement de soupape[1987/11]
Examination procedure27.08.1987Examination requested  [1987/43]
29.01.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M09)
15.02.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
05.07.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
03.05.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.06.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
07.01.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
25.01.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.06.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
03.09.1991Fee for grant paid
03.09.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
18.10.1991Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time
Opposition(s)29.12.1992No opposition filed within time limit [1993/11]
Request for further processing for:29.10.1991Request for further processing filed
31.10.1991Full payment received (date of receipt of payment)
Request granted
15.11.1991Decision despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.06.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
21.06.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
25.06.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
24.06.1991Renewal fee patent year 06
Documents cited:Search[AD]GB2141172  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD);
 [A]FR2510182  (RENAULT [FR]);
 [AP]GB2162245  (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD)
ExaminationEP0213758