Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0216475 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0216475



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 237
20.11.1990 Closing of application Search / examination 1
13.09.1990 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 1
13.09.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 4
11.09.1990 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
11.07.1990 Communication regarding the examination of the appeal (ex parte) Appeal 2
01.07.1990 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
13.09.1989 Refund of fees Search / examination 1
17.08.1989 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 10
21.07.1989 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
07.07.1989 Request for re-establishment of rights Appeal 4
06.07.1989 Request for re-establishment of rights Appeal 7
11.05.1989 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
11.05.1989 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Appeal 1
30.11.1988 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
30.11.1988 Payment of fees and costs Appeal 2
28.09.1988 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 9
11.08.1988 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
22.04.1988 Claims Search / examination 4
22.04.1988 Description Search / examination 12
22.04.1988 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
05.04.1988 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
23.03.1988 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
27.01.1988 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 2
21.01.1988 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
18.09.1987 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 15
05.05.1987 Payment of fees and costs Search / examination 1
05.05.1987 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
07.04.1987 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
18.02.1987 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
12.01.1987 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
12.01.1987 European search report Search / examination 2
05.08.1986 Abstract Search / examination 1
05.08.1986 Authorisation Search / examination 2
05.08.1986 Claims Search / examination 4
05.08.1986 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
05.08.1986 Description Search / examination 11
05.08.1986 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.08.1986 Drawings Search / examination 2
05.08.1986 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 4
05.08.1986 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 26
05.08.1986 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 8
05.08.1986 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 16
05.08.1986 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 18
05.08.1986 Patent document cited during the examination procedure Search / examination 10
05.08.1986 Priority document Search / examination 25
05.08.1986 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10