Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0219993 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0219993



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 205
11.11.1993 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
29.10.1993 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 17
29.10.1993 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 20
07.04.1993 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
06.04.1993 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
19.02.1993 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 3
01.12.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 8
01.12.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 12
01.12.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 4
01.12.1992 Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 16
01.12.1992 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
22.11.1992 Closing of application Search / examination 1
03.11.1992 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
03.11.1992 Advice of delivery Search / examination 2
22.10.1992 Annex Search / examination 4
22.10.1992 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 1
22.10.1992 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Search / examination 5
16.09.1992 Claims Search / examination 4
16.09.1992 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
11.09.1992 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 7
20.07.1992 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
13.07.1992 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
13.06.1992 Submission concerning representation Search / examination 1
13.03.1992 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 5
19.01.1990 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
19.01.1990 European search report Search / examination 1
18.03.1987 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
30.10.1986 Communication to designated inventor Search / examination 1
30.09.1986 Abstract Search / examination 1
30.09.1986 Claims Search / examination 4
30.09.1986 Description Search / examination 16
30.09.1986 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
30.09.1986 Drawings Search / examination 9
30.09.1986 Priority document Search / examination 39
30.09.1986 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10