Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0220943

EP0220943 - Method for making printing plates and assembly useful therein [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been refused
Status updated on  11.03.1994
Database last updated on 15.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
The Mead Corporation
Mead World Headquarters Courthouse Plaza Northeast Dayton
Ohio 45463 / US
[N/P]
Former [1987/19]For all designated states
THE MEAD CORPORATION
Mead World Headquarters Courthouse Plaza Northeast
Dayton Ohio 45463 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Shackle, Dale R.
2481 Pennyroyal Road
Springboro Ohio 45066 / US
02 / Cousin, Michael J.
123 East Street
Ashville Ohio 43103 / US
03 / Schwab, Gerhart
The Mead Corporation Courthouse Plaza Northeast
Dayton Ohio 45463 / US
04 / Narrick, Christina M.
19 Meadow Way
Chillicothe Ohio 45601 / US
05 / Fromson, Howard A.
15 Rogues Ridge Road
Weston Connecticut 06880 / US
[1987/19]
Representative(s)Deans, Michael John Percy , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP
90 Long Acre
London
WC2E 9RA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1987/19]Deans, Michael John Percy , et al
Lloyd Wise, Tregear & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand
London WC2R OAE / GB
Application number, filing date86308250.923.10.1986
[1987/19]
Priority number, dateUS1985079118525.10.1985         Original published format: US 791185
[1987/19]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0220943
Date:06.05.1987
Language:EN
[1987/19]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0220943
Date:29.06.1988
Language:EN
[1988/26]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.05.1988
ClassificationInternational:G03C1/76, G03C5/00, B41C1/06
[1987/19]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   NL [1987/19]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von Druckplatten und darin verwendbare Zusammensetzung[1987/19]
English:Method for making printing plates and assembly useful therein[1987/19]
French:Procédé de fabrication de plaques d'impression et assemblage utile à cet effet[1987/19]
Examination procedure10.01.1989Examination requested  [1989/22]
13.12.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
09.01.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
30.01.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
21.02.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.09.1991Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1994/18]
10.03.1994Application refused, date of legal effect [1994/18]
Appeal following examination05.11.1991Appeal received No.  T0160/92
14.01.1992Statement of grounds filed
27.01.1994Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the applicant was rejected
30.11.1993Date of oral proceedings
08.12.1993Minutes of oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
27.10.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
09.10.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
31.10.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
10.10.1991Renewal fee patent year 06
23.10.1992Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
30.12.1988M02   Fee paid on   10.01.1989
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.10.199308   M06   Not yet paid
Documents cited:Search[X]JP58224752  ;
 [Y]JP59002845  ;
 [A]JP59174394  ;
 [Y]US4399209  ;
 [A]FR2108292  ;
 [XP]DE3605120
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 80 (M-289)[1517], 12th April 1984; & JP-A-58 224 752 (MITSUBISHI SEISHI K.K.) 27-12-1983, & JP58224752 A 00000000
 [Y]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 87 (M-291)[1524], 20th April 1984; & JP-A-59 002 845 (MITSUBISHI SEISHI K.K.) 09-01-1984, & JP59002845 A 00000000
 [A]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 9, no. 29 (M-356)[1752], 7th February 1985; & JP-A-59 174 394 (MITSUBISHI SEISHI K.K.) 02-10-1984, & JP59174394 A 00000000