Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0220943 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0220943



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 170
11.03.1994 Closing of application Search / examination 1
28.02.1994 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
08.12.1993 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
08.12.1993 Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee Appeal 1
30.11.1993 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 18
30.11.1993 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.11.1993 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 5
30.11.1993 Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding appeal procedure Appeal 2
30.11.1993 F3314 Oral proceedings: Minutes (ex parte) Appeal 2
21.09.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
01.09.1993 Communication (no form) Appeal 8
01.09.1993 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 1
18.08.1993 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (ex parte) Appeal 1
17.08.1993 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
14.11.1992 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
08.10.1992 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
05.10.1992 F3313 Order: change of Board due to the technical aspects of the appeal Appeal 1
05.06.1992 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 1
19.05.1992 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) Appeal 1
14.01.1992 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 11
05.11.1991 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
05.11.1991 Notice of appeal Appeal 2
05.11.1991 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.11.1991 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
05.11.1991 Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure Appeal 1
17.09.1991 Consultation by telephone/in person Search / examination 3
04.09.1991 Decision to refuse the application (examining division) Search / examination 8
06.08.1991 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Search / examination 1
06.05.1991 Annex Search / examination 2
06.05.1991 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
21.02.1991 Annex Search / examination 2
21.02.1991 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
30.01.1991 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
09.01.1991 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
13.12.1990 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
10.01.1989 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
05.07.1988 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
11.05.1988 General enquiry Search / examination 1
09.05.1988 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
09.05.1988 European search report Search / examination 2
26.03.1987 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
11.12.1986 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
11.12.1986 Priority document Search / examination 30
12.11.1986 Drawings Search / examination 1
12.11.1986 Matter concerning the application Search / examination 1
23.10.1986 Abstract Search / examination 1
23.10.1986 Claims Search / examination 3
23.10.1986 Description Search / examination 15
23.10.1986 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
23.10.1986 Drawings Search / examination 1
23.10.1986 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 12