Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0224339

EP0224339 - Pyrimidine derivative, process for preparing same and agricultural or horticultural fungicidal composition containing same [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  01.11.1991
Database last updated on 07.12.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip01.11.1991No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.12.1991 [1991/52]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
KUMIAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD.
No. 4-26, Ikenohata 1-chome Taitoh-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
IHARA CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD.
4-26, Ikenohata 1-chome Taitoh-ku
Tokyo 110-0008 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1987/23]For all designated states
KUMIAI CHEMICAL INDUSTRY CO., LTD.
No. 4-26, Ikenohata 1-chome Taitoh-ku
Tokyo / JP
For all designated states
IHARA CHEMICAL INDUSTRY Co., Ltd.
4-26, Ikenohata 1-chome
Taitoh-ku, Tokyo 110 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Ito, Shigekazu
685-3, Nakajima, Fukude-cho
Iwata-gun Shizuoka / JP
02 / Masuda, Katsumi
132, Kojima, Fukude-cho
Iwata-gun Shizuoka / JP
03 / Kusano, Shoji
17-12, Nunobashi 1-chome
Hamamatsu-shi Shizuoka / JP
04 / Nagata, Toshikhiro
155 Imataki, Daito-cho
Ogasa-gun Shizuoka / JP
05 / Kojima, Yoshiyuki
69 Kougosho, Kakegawa-shi
Shizuoka / JP
06 / Sawai, Nobumitsu
1809, Kamo, Kikugawa-cho
Ogasa-gun Shizuoka / JP
07 / Maeno, Shin-Ichiro
1809 Kamo, Kikigawa-cho
Ogasa-gun Shizuoka / JP
[1987/23]
Representative(s)Pearce, Anthony Richmond , et al
Marks & Clerk LLP Alpha Tower Suffolk Street Queensway Birmingham
B1 1TT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1987/23]Pearce, Anthony Richmond , et al
MARKS & CLERK, Alpha Tower, Suffolk Street Queensway
Birmingham B1 1TT / GB
Application number, filing date86308422.429.10.1986
[1987/23]
Priority number, dateJP1985024347630.10.1985         Original published format: JP 24347685
JP1986017835429.07.1986         Original published format: JP 17835486
[1987/23]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0224339
Date:03.06.1987
Language:EN
[1987/23]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0224339
Date:13.04.1988
Language:EN
[1988/15]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0224339
Date:02.01.1991
Language:EN
[1991/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.02.1988
ClassificationInternational:C07D239/52, C07D239/46, C07D239/48, C07D239/42, A01N43/54
[1987/23]
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL [1987/23]
TitleGerman:Pyrimidinderivate, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und diese enthaltende fungizide Zusammensetzung, für Landwirtschaft und Gartenbau[1991/01]
English:Pyrimidine derivative, process for preparing same and agricultural or horticultural fungicidal composition containing same[1987/23]
French:Dérivés de pyrimidine, leur procédé de préparation et composition fongicide les contenant utile en agriculture et en horticulture[1987/23]
Former [1987/23]Pyrimidinderivate, Verfahren zu deren Herstellung und diese enthaltende fungizide Zusammensetzung, verwendbar in der Landwirtschaft und im Gartenbau
Examination procedure05.05.1988Examination requested  [1988/27]
19.06.1989Request for accelerated examination filed
09.08.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.08.1989Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
05.02.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
28.03.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
07.06.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.08.1990Fee for grant paid
07.08.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)03.10.1991No opposition filed within time limit [1991/52]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.10.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
09.10.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
12.10.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[AD]GB1245085  (ICI LTD [GB]);
 [A]EP0135472  (CIBA GEIGY AG [CH]);
 [A]FR922448  (ICI LTD);
 [A]FR7324M