Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0225130

EP0225130 - Liposome composition [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.09.1992
Database last updated on 21.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip03.09.1992No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 21.10.1992 [1992/43]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd.
1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome
Chuo-ku, Osaka / JP
[1992/40]
Former [1989/50]For all designated states
TAKEDA CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD.
1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome, Chuo-ku
Osaka-fu / JP
Former [1987/24]For all designated states
Takeda Chemical Industries, Ltd.
1-1, Doshomachi 4-chome
Chuo-ku, Osaka / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Hamaguchi, Naoru
6-704, 2 Shirakawa 3-chome
Ibaraki Osaka 567 / JP
02 / Iga, Katsumi
A-808, 1 Satsukigaokanishi
Suita Osaka 563 / JP
03 / Ogawa, Yasuaki
32-503, 7 Nakahozumi 1-chome
Ibaraki Osaka 567 / JP
[1987/24]
Representative(s)Lewin, John Harvey , et al
Elkington and Fife LLP
Prospect House
8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks
Kent TN13 1XR / GB
[N/P]
Former [1987/24]Lewin, John Harvey , et al
Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road
Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB
Application number, filing date86309079.120.11.1986
[1987/24]
Priority number, dateJP1985026273922.11.1985         Original published format: JP 26273985
[1987/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0225130
Date:10.06.1987
Language:EN
[1987/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0225130
Date:25.11.1987
Language:EN
[1987/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0225130
Date:30.10.1991
Language:EN
[1991/44]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.10.1987
ClassificationInternational:A61K9/50
[1987/24]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1987/24]
TitleGerman:Liposomzusammensetzung[1987/24]
English:Liposome composition[1987/24]
French:Composition de liposomes[1987/24]
Examination procedure24.03.1988Examination requested  [1988/22]
27.10.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
26.02.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.07.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.09.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
04.01.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.05.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.07.1991Fee for grant paid
15.07.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)31.07.1992No opposition filed within time limit [1992/43]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
09.11.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
20.11.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
Documents cited:Search[Y]EP0126580  (VESTAR RESEARCH INC [US]);
 [Y]EP0072234  (WELLCOME FOUND [GB]);
 [Y]US4515736  (DEAMER DAVID W [US]);
 [Y]GB2157172  (SANDOZ LTD)
 [X]  - BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 24, May 1985, pages 2833-2842, American Chemical Society, Washington, DC, US; R.P. LENK et al.: "Novel multilayered lipid vesicles: comparison of physical characteristics of multilamellar liposomes and stable plurilamellar vesicles"
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 97, no. 5, 2nd August 1982, page 215, abstract no. 35016q, Columbus, Ohio, US; L.A. TONKONOG et al.: "Permeability of liposomes with different cholesterol content at low temperatures", & UKR. BIOKHIM. ZH. 1982, 54(3), 293-7
 [X]  - BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 24, February 1985, pages 1092-1098, American Chemical Society, Washington, DC, US; Y.-S. TSAO et al.: "Sendai virus induced leakage of liposomes containing gangliosides"
 [X]  - BIOCHEMISTRY, vol. 20, June 1981, pages 3462-3467, American Chemical Society, Washington, DC, US; D. LICHTENBERG et al.: "Effect of surface curvature on stability, thermodynamic behavior, and osmotic activity of dipalmitoylphosphatidylcholine single lamellar vesicles"
 [Y]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 100, no. 2, 9th January 1984, page 357, abstract no. 12523u, Columbus, Ohio, US; B. SUR et al.: "Effect of liposomal encapsulation of cis-platinum diamminodichloride in the treatment of Ehrlich ascites carcinoma", & ONCOLOGY 1983, 40(5), 372-6
 [Y]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 94, no. 20, 18th May 1981, page 382, abstract no. 162698b, Columbus, Ohio, US; A.M. MICHELSON et al.: "Penetration of erythrocytes by superoxide dismutase", & DEV. BIOCHEM. 1980, 11B(Biol. Clin. Aspects Superoxide Superoxide Dismutase), 348-66