blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0225137

EP0225137 - Process for producing a tetraalkoxysilane [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.01.1994
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip13.01.1994No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 02.03.1994 [1994/09]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Chisso Corporation
6-32, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 530-0055 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1987/24]For all designated states
Chisso Corporation
6-32, Nakanoshima 3-chome Kita-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka-fu / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Inaba, Shinichi
4-212, Chikuji
Minamata-shi Kumamoto-ken / JP
02 / Honda, Shuichi
11-1, Jinnai 2-chome
Minamata-shi Kumamoto-ken / JP
03 / Koga, Kohji
11-1, Jinnai 2-chome
Minamata-shi Kumamoto-ken / JP
[1987/24]
Representative(s)Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al
Marks & Clerk LLP 62-68 Hills Road Cambridge
CB2 1LA / GB
[N/P]
Former [1987/24]Ruffles, Graham Keith, et al
MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields
London WC2A 3LS / GB
Application number, filing date86309111.220.11.1986
[1987/24]
Priority number, dateJP1985026036820.11.1985         Original published format: JP 26036885
[1987/24]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0225137
Date:10.06.1987
Language:EN
[1987/24]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0225137
Date:27.09.1989
Language:EN
[1989/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0225137
Date:10.03.1993
Language:EN
[1993/10]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.08.1989
ClassificationIPC:C07F7/04
[1987/24]
CPC:
C07F7/04 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1987/24]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Tetraalkoxysilans[1987/24]
English:Process for producing a tetraalkoxysilane[1987/24]
French:Procédé pour la préparation d'une tétraalcoxysilane[1987/24]
Examination procedure26.01.1990Examination requested  [1990/14]
18.12.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
16.04.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.05.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
18.08.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
23.09.1992Fee for grant paid
23.09.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)11.12.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1994/09]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.11.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
09.11.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
20.11.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
11.11.1991Renewal fee patent year 06
09.10.1992Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]JP56118088  ;
 [A]GB343165  (HANS PAUL KAUFMANN);
 [AD]GB2018800  (DYNAMIT NOBEL AG);
 [A]US4207247  (KNOLLMUELLER KARL O [US])
 [X]  - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 5, no. 195, 11th December 1981, page 74 C 83; & JP-A-56 118 088 (SHOWA DENKO K.K.) 16-09-1981, & JP56118088 A 00000000
ExaminationJPS56118088
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.