blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0227337

EP0227337 - Process for manufacturing photochromic articles [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.01.1993
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip21.01.1993No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 10.03.1993 [1993/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
PILKINGTON PLC
Prescot Road St. Helens
Merseyside WA10 3TT / GB
[N/P]
Former [1992/02]For all designated states
PILKINGTON PLC
Prescot Road
St. Helens, Merseyside WA10 3TT / GB
Former [1987/27]For all designated states
PILKINGTON BROTHERS P.L.C.
Prescot Road St. Helens
Merseyside, WA10 3TT / GB
Inventor(s)01 / Maltman, William Ramsey
"Lynton", Regents Road
St. Helens Merseyside WA10 3JA / GB
02 / Threlfall, Ian Michael
20 Windemere Road Hindley
Wigan Lancashire WN2 30F / GB
[1987/27]
Representative(s)Pendlebury, Anthony, et al
PAGE, WHITE & FARRER 54 Doughty Street
London WC1N 2LS / GB
[1987/27]
Application number, filing date86309352.201.12.1986
[1987/27]
Priority number, dateGB1985003129519.12.1985         Original published format: GB 8531295
[1987/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0227337
Date:01.07.1987
Language:EN
[1987/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0227337
Date:27.09.1989
Language:EN
[1989/39]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0227337
Date:18.03.1992
Language:EN
[1992/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP10.08.1989
ClassificationIPC:G03C1/72, G02B1/04
[1987/27]
CPC:
G03C1/685 (EP,US); C08K5/16 (KR); C08F2/44 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   IT [1991/40]
Former [1987/27]AT,  BE,  CH,  DE,  ES,  FR,  GR,  IT,  LI,  LU,  NL,  SE 
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung von photochromen Gegenständen[1987/27]
English:Process for manufacturing photochromic articles[1987/27]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'articles photochromiques[1987/27]
Examination procedure19.02.1990Examination requested  [1990/17]
24.09.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
25.01.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.04.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.08.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
04.11.1991Fee for grant paid
04.11.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)19.12.1992No opposition filed within time limit [1993/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
16.12.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
19.12.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
20.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
27.12.1991Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XD]EP0141407  (PPG INDUSTRIES INC [US]);
 [YP]EP0171909  (TORAY INDUSTRIES [JP]);
 [Y]FR1578459  ;
 [Y]EP0134633  (AMERICAN OPTICAL CORP [US]);
 [A]EP0146135  (RODENSTOCK OPTIK G [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.