blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0225793

EP0225793 - Use of ion exchange resin mixtures in cation exchange processes [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1987/25]Ion exchange resin mixtures and their use in cation exchange processes
[1991/06]
StatusPatent revoked
Status updated on  28.11.1994
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting state
State(s) deleted from list of lapses: CH, LI
published on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY
Independence Mall West
Philadelphia
Pennsylvania 19105 / US
[N/P]
Former [1987/25]For all designated states
ROHM AND HAAS COMPANY
Independence Mall West
Philadelphia Pennsylvania 19105 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Prunac, Alain Denis Louis
92 Rue de Cornouailles
F-78180 Montigny-Le-Bretonneux / FR
02 / Baur, Daniel Michel
487 Chemin des Pertuades
06220 Golfe Juan / FR
03 / Poirson, Jean Pierre Marcel
Clos de Mougins 107/2 Impasse Des Chenes
F-06250 Mougins / FR
[1987/25]
Representative(s)Angell, David Whilton
ROHM AND HAAS European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue Croydon
CR9 3NB / GB
[N/P]
Former [1987/25]Angell, David Whilton
ROHM AND HAAS European Operations Patent Department Lennig House 2 Mason's Avenue
Croydon CR9 3NB / GB
Application number, filing date86309492.605.12.1986
[1987/25]
Priority number, dateGB1985003027509.12.1985         Original published format: GB 8530275
[1987/25]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0225793
Date:16.06.1987
Language:EN
[1987/25]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0225793
Date:21.10.1987
Language:EN
[1987/43]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0225793
Date:06.02.1991
Language:EN
[1991/06]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP02.09.1987
ClassificationIPC:B01J47/04
[1987/25]
CPC:
B01J47/04 (EP); B01J43/00 (KR)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1987/25]
TitleGerman:Verwendung von Ionenaustauscherharzmischungen in Kationenaustauschverfahren[1991/06]
English:Use of ion exchange resin mixtures in cation exchange processes[1991/06]
French:Utilisation de mélanges de résines échangeuses d'ions dans des procédés d'échanges cationiques[1991/06]
Former [1987/25]Ionenaustauscherharzmischungen und deren Verwendung in Kationenaustauschverfahren
Former [1987/25]Ion exchange resin mixtures and their use in cation exchange processes
Former [1987/25]Mélanges de résines échangeuses d'ions et leur utilisation dans des procédés d'échanges cationiques
Examination procedure15.06.1987Examination requested  [1987/34]
22.02.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
14.08.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
16.11.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
30.01.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.03.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
17.05.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
07.06.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.07.1990Fee for grant paid
02.07.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  06.06.1991  06.08.1991  ADMISSIBLE
Bayer AG, Leverkusen Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern
Bayerwerk
D-51368 Leverkusen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1991/34]
Opponent(s)01  06.06.1991  06.08.1991  ADMISSIBLE
Bayer AG, Leverkusen Konzernverwaltung RP Patente Konzern
Bayerwerk
D-51368 Leverkusen / DE
12.12.1991Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
17.06.1992Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
11.01.1993Date of oral proceedings
16.03.1993Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
16.03.1993Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings
01.04.1993Reply to a communication from the opposition division
16.11.1993Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
10.11.1994Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked
28.11.1994Legal effect of revocation of patent [1995/03]
Appeal following opposition20.12.1993Appeal received No.  T1061/93
10.03.1994Statement of grounds filed
10.11.1994Result of appeal procedure: REVOCATION OF PATENT AT PROPRIETOR'S REQUEST
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.11.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
21.11.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
19.11.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  Tooltipdeleted
[2015/21]
Former [1995/17]CH06.02.1991
LI06.02.1991
Documents cited:Search[A]GB670350  (ROHM & HAAS);
 [A]US2962438  (SMITH VERITY C);
 [A]US3250702  (LEVENDUSKY JOSEPH A);
 [A]US4252905  (BASS WALTER C);
 [A]DE3248126  (ALHAEUSER ERICH)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.