Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP All documents: EP0225793 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0225793



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 306
24.04.1996 Disapproval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
30.01.1996 Claims Search / examination 2
30.01.1996 Description Search / examination 3
30.01.1996 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
18.11.1994 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
18.11.1994 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
10.11.1994 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 4
28.10.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
25.10.1994 Request for revocation of patent Appeal 1
18.10.1994 Note of consultation between member and appellant / representative Appeal 1
19.08.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.08.1994 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
20.04.1994 F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) Appeal 1
23.03.1994 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
10.03.1994 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 8
20.01.1994 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
19.01.1994 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
18.01.1994 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
20.12.1993 Notice of appeal Appeal 1
30.11.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
24.11.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
19.11.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
16.11.1993 Decision of the Opposition Division Opposition 1
16.11.1993 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 11
16.11.1993 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.1993 Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings Opposition 1
16.11.1993 Means of redress Opposition 1
16.11.1993 Text intended for grant Opposition 7
19.04.1993 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
01.04.1993 Description Opposition 1
01.04.1993 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
16.03.1993 Annex to a communication Opposition 1
16.03.1993 Annex to the communication Opposition 5
16.03.1993 Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) Opposition 2
16.03.1993 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
16.03.1993 Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings Opposition 1
11.12.1992 Letter dealing with oral proceedings Opposition 3
11.12.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
11.12.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 7
11.12.1992 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 11
08.12.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 2
08.12.1992 Claims Opposition 2
08.12.1992 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.12.1992 Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings Opposition 3
11.11.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
09.11.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
06.11.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
05.11.1992 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
05.11.1992 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
31.10.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
31.10.1992 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
29.10.1992 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
26.10.1992 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
26.10.1992 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
26.10.1992 Summons to attend oral proceedings (Site = Bayerstrasse 34) Opposition 1
08.10.1992 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 1
10.09.1992 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
07.09.1992 Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings Opposition 3
03.09.1992 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Opposition 2
03.09.1992 Result of consultation by telephone/in person Opposition 1
01.09.1992 Annex to the communication Opposition 3
01.09.1992 Information concerning oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.09.1992 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
01.09.1992 Preparation of oral proceedings Opposition 1
18.08.1992 Preparation for oral proceedings Opposition 1
02.07.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
23.06.1992 Claims Opposition 2
23.06.1992 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 3
17.06.1992 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 5
06.04.1992 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
26.03.1992 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
12.12.1991 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
12.12.1991 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
15.07.1991 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
06.06.1991 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
06.06.1991 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
06.06.1991 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
06.06.1991 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 8
06.06.1991 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 20
06.06.1991 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
06.06.1991 Patent document cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
07.01.1991 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
16.08.1990 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
16.08.1990 Translation of the claims Search / examination 2
16.08.1990 Translation of the claims Search / examination 3
07.06.1990 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 4
26.03.1990 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
26.03.1990 Text intended for grant Search / examination 13
12.03.1990 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
16.11.1989 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
14.08.1989 Claims Search / examination 1
14.08.1989 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
04.07.1989 Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) Search / examination 1
24.06.1989 Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 1
22.02.1989 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 3
10.11.1987 Maintenance of the application Search / examination 1
27.10.1987 Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application Search / examination 1
02.09.1987 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
02.09.1987 European search report Search / examination 2
09.07.1987 Letter concerning the inventor Search / examination 1
15.06.1987 Written request for examination Search / examination 1
07.05.1987 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
18.02.1987 Invitation to indicate correct address of inventor Search / examination 1
10.02.1987 Letter which had not been notified Search / examination 3
23.12.1986 Letter concerning the priority Search / examination 1
23.12.1986 Priority document Search / examination 12
05.12.1986 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
05.12.1986 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Search / examination 1
05.12.1986 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10
05.12.1985 Abstract Search / examination 1
05.12.1985 Claims Search / examination 2
05.12.1985 Description Search / examination 10