Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0228899

EP0228899 - System for integrally controlling automatic transmission and engine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.06.1991
Database last updated on 21.01.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip20.06.1991No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 07.08.1991 [1991/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi, Aichi-ken, 471-8571 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1987/29]For all designated states
TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA
1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi
Aichi-ken 471 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Yasue, Hideki Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi 471 / JP
02 / Fukumura, Kagenori Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi 471 / JP
03 / Iwatsuki, Kunihiro Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi 471 / JP
04 / Shindo, Yoshio Toyota Jidosha Kabushiki Kaisha
1, Toyota-cho
Toyota-shi Aichi 471 / JP
[1987/29]
Representative(s)Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street
London W1G 8ER / GB
[N/P]
Former [1987/29]Ben-Nathan, Laurence Albert , et al
Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street
London W1M 8AH / GB
Application number, filing date86310085.523.12.1986
[1987/29]
Priority number, dateJP1985029001623.12.1985         Original published format: JP 29001685
JP1985029001723.12.1985         Original published format: JP 29001785
JP1985029146024.12.1985         Original published format: JP 29146085
JP1985029398526.12.1985         Original published format: JP 29398585
JP1985029519827.12.1985         Original published format: JP 29519885
JP1986001604128.01.1986         Original published format: JP 1604186
JP1986002865212.02.1986         Original published format: JP 2865286
JP1986002865312.02.1986         Original published format: JP 2865386
[1987/29]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0228899
Date:15.07.1987
Language:EN
[1987/29]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0228899
Date:19.11.1987
Language:EN
[1987/47]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0228899
Date:16.08.1990
Language:EN
[1990/33]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP28.09.1987
ClassificationInternational:B60K41/06
[1990/33]
Former International [1987/29]F16H5/40, F02D41/00
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1987/29]
TitleGerman:Integriertes Kontrollsystem für automatisches Getriebe und Motor[1987/29]
English:System for integrally controlling automatic transmission and engine[1987/29]
French:Système de commande intégrée pour une transmission automatique et moteur[1987/29]
Examination procedure25.04.1988Examination requested  [1988/25]
27.01.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
13.07.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.10.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.02.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.03.1990Fee for grant paid
24.03.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)17.05.1991No opposition filed within time limit [1991/32]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.11.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
14.11.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[Y]GB2156017  (NIPPON DENSO CO, et al);
 [Y]EP0127001  (BENDIX CORP [US]);
 [A]EP0130811  (ISUZU MOTORS LTD [JP], et al);
 [A]GB2042658  (SRM HYDROMEKANIK AB);
 [A]US4208929  (GRUBEN WAYNE E [US], et al);
 [A]US4543934  (MORITA TATSUO [JP], et al)
ExaminationGB2058255
    - BOSCH, Cahier technique , 1983, "Electronique appliquée au moteur"