blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0190969

EP0190969 - Lipid osmotic pump [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  24.12.1993
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip24.12.1993No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 16.02.1994 [1994/07]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Merck & Co., Inc.
126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000 Rahway
New Jersey 07065-0900 / US
[N/P]
Former [1986/33]For all designated states
MERCK & CO. INC.
126, East Lincoln Avenue P.O. Box 2000
Rahway New Jersey 07065-0900 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Amidon, Gordon L.
555 E. William Street, Apt. 21A
Ann Arbor Michigan 48014 / US
02 / Dressman, Jennifer B.
555 E. William Street, Apt. 21A
Ann Arbor Michigan 48014 / US
03 / Higuchi, Takeru
2811 Schwartz Road
Lawrence Kansas 66044 / US
[1986/33]
Representative(s)Ahner, Francis, et al
Cabinet Regimbeau
20, rue de Chazelles
75847 Paris Cedex 17 / FR
[N/P]
Former [1986/33]Ahner, Francis, et al
CABINET REGIMBEAU 26, avenue Kléber
F-75116 Paris / FR
Application number, filing date86400180.529.01.1986
[1986/33]
Priority number, dateUS1985069710501.02.1985         Original published format: US 697105
[1986/33]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0190969
Date:13.08.1986
Language:EN
[1986/33]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0190969
Date:04.11.1987
Language:EN
[1987/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0190969
Date:24.02.1993
Language:EN
[1993/08]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.09.1987
ClassificationIPC:A61K9/22
[1986/33]
CPC:
A61K9/5042 (EP,US); A61K9/0004 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1986/33]
TitleGerman:Osmotische Pumpe für Lipide[1986/33]
English:Lipid osmotic pump[1986/33]
French:Pompe osmotique pour lipides[1986/33]
Examination procedure08.02.1988Examination requested  [1988/14]
07.07.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
23.10.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.08.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
31.12.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.04.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
09.09.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.03.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
30.07.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
06.08.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
02.11.1992Fee for grant paid
02.11.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)25.11.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1994/07]
Fees paidRenewal fee
21.12.1987Renewal fee patent year 03
12.12.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
18.12.1989Renewal fee patent year 05
24.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 06
21.01.1992Renewal fee patent year 07
14.12.1992Renewal fee patent year 08
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]US3915855  (TENG JAMES, et al);
 [AD]US3995632  (NAKANO MASAHIRO, et al);
 [Y]US4256108  (THEEUWES FELIX);
 [YD]US4350271  (ECKENHOFF JAMES B)
 [A]  - TAPPI, vol. 48, no. 1, January 1985, pages 103A-107A, Technical Association of the Pulp and Paper Industry, Easton, Pa., US; L.E. HERDLE et al.: "Partially acetylated cellulose - its properties and potential applications"
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.