blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0193448

EP0193448 - Static circuit interrupter with a numerical treatment chain in parallel with an analogous treatment chain [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  16.02.1991
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip09.03.1991Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT, NL
published on 24.04.1991 [1991/17]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
MERLIN GERIN
Rue Henri Tarze
F-38050 Grenoble Cédex / FR
[1986/36]
Inventor(s)01 / Demeyer, Pierre
Merlin Gerin
F-38050 Grenoble Cedex / FR
[1986/36]
Representative(s)Kern, Paul, et al
Merlin Gerin Sce. Brevets 20, rue Henri Tarze
38050 Grenoble Cédex / FR
[N/P]
Former [1986/36]Kern, Paul, et al
Merlin Gerin Sce. Brevets 20, rue Henri Tarze
F-38050 Grenoble Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date86400284.510.02.1986
[1986/36]
Priority number, dateFR1985000316125.02.1985         Original published format: FR 8503161
[1986/36]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0193448
Date:03.09.1986
Language:FR
[1986/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0193448
Date:25.04.1990
Language:FR
[1990/17]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP03.07.1986
ClassificationIPC:H02H3/093
[1986/36]
CPC:
H02H3/0935 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   GB,   IT,   LI,   NL,   SE [1986/36]
TitleGerman:Statische Auslöseeinheit für Leistungsschalter mit parallel zu einer analogen Verarbeitungskette wirkender numerischer Verarbeitungskette[1986/36]
English:Static circuit interrupter with a numerical treatment chain in parallel with an analogous treatment chain[1986/36]
French:Disjoncteur à déclencheur statique à chaîne de traîtement numérique shunté par une chaîne de traîtement analogique[1986/36]
Examination procedure14.02.1987Examination requested  [1987/16]
18.02.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.06.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
06.04.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.08.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
07.11.1989Fee for grant paid
07.11.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)26.01.1991No opposition filed within time limit [1991/15]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.02.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
10.02.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
14.02.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT25.04.1990
NL25.04.1990
SE25.04.1990
[1991/17]
Former [1990/50]SE25.04.1990
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0133968  (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.