blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0198730

EP0198730 - Regeneration process of a used catalyst by an aqueous hydrogen peroxide solution stabilized by an organic compound [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  18.10.1989
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip18.10.1989No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.12.1989 [1989/49]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Institut Français du Pétrole
4, Avenue de Bois Préau
92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR
[N/P]
Former [1986/43]For all designated states
INSTITUT FRANCAIS DU PETROLE
4, Avenue de Bois Préau
F-92502 Rueil-Malmaison / FR
Inventor(s)01 / Trinh, Dinh Chan
7, Allée des Oeillets
F-78110 Le Vesinet / FR
02 / Desvard, Alain
45, avenue des Tulipes
F-78310 Elancourt / FR
03 / Martino, Germain
Batiment Condé 80, avenue F. Lefebvre
F-78300 Poissy / FR
[1986/43]
Application number, filing date86400438.703.03.1986
[1986/43]
Priority number, dateFR1985000340908.03.1985         Original published format: FR 8503409
[1986/43]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0198730
Date:22.10.1986
Language:FR
[1986/43]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0198730
Date:11.03.1987
Language:FR
[1987/11]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0198730
Date:14.12.1988
Language:FR
[1988/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP20.01.1987
ClassificationIPC:B01J23/94, B01J38/00
[1986/43]
CPC:
B01J23/94 (EP,US); B01J27/30 (EP,US); Y10S502/516 (EP,US);
Y10S502/517 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   DE,   GB,   IT,   NL [1986/43]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Regenerierung eines verbrauchten Katalysators mittels einer mit einer organischen Verbindung stabilisierten wässrigen Lösung von Wasserstoffperoxyd[1986/43]
English:Regeneration process of a used catalyst by an aqueous hydrogen peroxide solution stabilized by an organic compound[1986/43]
French:Procédé de régénération d'un catalyseur usagé par une solution aqueuse de peroxyde d'hydrogène stabilisée par un composé organique[1986/43]
Examination procedure27.03.1987Examination requested  [1987/22]
04.03.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.06.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
12.09.1988Fee for grant paid
12.09.1988Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)15.09.1989No opposition filed within time limit [1989/49]
Fees paidRenewal fee
20.01.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2948771  (NITTO CHEMCIAL IND LTD);
 [A]GB1221975  (GULF RESEARCH DEVELOPMENT CO [US]);
 [A]US4268415  (MOHAN RAAM R, et al);
 [A]DE1296130  (UNIVERSAL OIL PROD CO)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.