blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0212993

EP0212993 - Electrical remotely-controlled apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  20.01.1994
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip11.07.2008Change - representativepublished on 13.08.2008  [2008/33]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
HAGER ELECTRO S.A.
Boulevard d'Europe
F-67210 Obernai / FR
[1987/10]
Inventor(s)01 / Beck, Dominique
13 rue Hohenbourg
F-67530 Ottrott / FR
[1987/10]
Representative(s)Bernasconi, Jean Raymond, et al
Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
[N/P]
Former [2008/33]Bernasconi, Jean Raymond, et al
Cabinet Lavoix 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR
Former [1987/10]Bernasconi, Jean, et al
c/o Cabinet Lavoix, 2, Place d'Estienne d'Orves
F-75441 Paris Cédex / FR
Application number, filing date86401154.930.05.1986
[1987/10]
Priority number, dateFR1985000877911.06.1985         Original published format: FR 8508779
[1987/10]
Filing languageFR
Procedural languageFR
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0212993
Date:04.03.1987
Language:FR
[1987/10]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0212993
Date:17.03.1993
Language:FR
[1993/11]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP18.12.1986
ClassificationIPC:H01H47/22
[1987/10]
CPC:
H01H47/226 (EP)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI [1987/10]
TitleGerman:Elektrische ferngesteuerte Anlagen[1987/10]
English:Electrical remotely-controlled apparatus[1987/10]
French:Perfectionnement aux appareils de télécommande électriques[1987/10]
Examination procedure08.09.1987Examination requested  [1989/20]
29.11.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
22.03.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.04.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
29.07.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.01.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No)
30.04.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval)
07.05.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.07.1992Fee for grant paid
24.07.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)18.12.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1994/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
08.07.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
05.05.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
17.05.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
23.05.1991Renewal fee patent year 06
20.05.1992Renewal fee patent year 07
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
04.09.1987M02   Fee paid on   30.09.1987
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.198803   M06   Fee paid on   08.07.1988
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipIT17.03.1993
CH31.05.1993
LI31.05.1993
[1999/42]
Former [1994/18]CH31.05.1993
LI31.05.1993
Documents cited:Search[Y]FR1209706  ;
 [Y]FR2498807  ;
 [A]EP0050301  ;
 [A]FR1387982
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.