Extract from the Register of European Patents

All documents: EP0225822 Dossier alert: RSS Email

Subscribe to email alerts


Dossier(s):   EP0225822



A confirmation email will be sent to the email address indicated






Date Document type Procedure Number of pages
Total number of pages: 306
08.02.2013 CDS Clean up - amended opponent data Opposition 1
06.02.2013 CDS Clean up - amended opponent data Opposition 1
25.06.2008 CDS Clean up - amended opponent data Opposition 1
21.02.1997 Communication for party to proceedings/third party Opposition 1
21.02.1997 Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent Opposition 1
14.02.1997 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
14.02.1997 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
14.02.1997 F3032 Notification(s) of the decision Appeal 1
11.12.1996 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
11.12.1996 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
11.12.1996 F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes Appeal 1
03.12.1996 Data sheet for the decision Appeal 16
03.12.1996 F3315 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant : Proprietor) Appeal 2
18.11.1996 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
18.11.1996 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
18.11.1996 F3022 Oral proceedings: change of board composition Appeal 1
12.11.1996 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
08.11.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
08.11.1996 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
04.11.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Appeal 1
31.10.1996 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 5
13.08.1996 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
13.08.1996 F3018 Oral proceedings: Confirmation interpreters Appeal 1
02.08.1996 Acknowledgement of a document Appeal 2
31.07.1996 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.07.1996 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
30.07.1996 Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed Appeal 1
27.07.1996 Advice of delivery Appeal 2
25.07.1996 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
25.07.1996 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
25.07.1996 F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons Appeal 2
25.07.1996 Oral proceedings: Annex to summons Appeal 9
01.07.1996 F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons Appeal 1
01.07.1996 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
01.07.1996 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
01.07.1996 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
01.07.1996 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
01.07.1996 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
01.07.1996 Oral proceedings: FAX proposing dates (inter partes) Appeal 1
17.02.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
17.02.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.02.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
11.02.1994 F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties Appeal 1
09.02.1994 Statement of grounds of appeal Appeal 3
03.02.1994 Notice of appeal Appeal 7
04.10.1993 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
04.10.1993 Communication (no form) Appeal 1
29.09.1993 Notice of appeal Appeal 12
30.08.1993 Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (inter partes) Appeal 1
30.08.1993 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
30.08.1993 Communication to respondent(s) concerning the filing of an appeal Appeal 1
27.08.1993 Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) Appeal 1
21.07.1993 Letter relating to Appeal Procedure Appeal 2
11.06.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
08.06.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
07.06.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
07.06.1993 Acknowledgement of a document Opposition 2
07.06.1993 Advice of delivery Opposition 2
22.05.1993 Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure Opposition 1
21.10.1992 Document concerning representation Search / examination 1
03.06.1992 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
03.06.1992 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
03.06.1992 Decision revoking the European patent Opposition 1
03.06.1992 Grounds for the decision (Annex) Opposition 9
03.06.1992 Means of redress Opposition 1
15.05.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
15.05.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
12.05.1992 Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction Opposition 1
10.02.1992 Brief communication to applicant/representative Opposition 1
29.01.1992 Reply from the opponent to submission of proprietor Opposition 4
23.12.1991 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
23.12.1991 Communication of observations of the patent proprietor to opponent(s) with time limit Opposition 1
04.12.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 3
04.12.1991 Claims Opposition 3
04.12.1991 Letter accompanying subsequently filed items Opposition 1
04.12.1991 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 1
03.12.1991 Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition Opposition 7
04.10.1991 Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) Opposition 1
23.09.1991 Request for extension of time limit Opposition 1
27.05.1991 Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations Opposition 1
27.05.1991 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
27.05.1991 Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) Opposition 1
19.04.1991 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
10.04.1991 Notice of opposition Opposition 6
27.03.1991 Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor Opposition 1
22.02.1991 Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter Opposition 9
22.02.1991 Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) Opposition 1
22.02.1991 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 4
22.02.1991 Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure Opposition 6
22.02.1991 Notice of opposition Opposition 4
13.07.1990 Transmission of the certificate Search / examination 1
01.06.1990 Decision to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
26.02.1990 English translation of the claims Search / examination 2
26.02.1990 Filing of the translations of the claims Search / examination 1
26.02.1990 German translation of the claims Search / examination 2
11.01.1990 Invitation to pay the fees for intended grant Search / examination 2
02.01.1990 Approval to announcement of intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 1
07.09.1989 Communication about intention to grant a European patent Search / examination 2
07.09.1989 Text intended for grant Search / examination 20
17.08.1989 Documents for grant of a patent Search / examination 2
04.07.1989 Claims Search / examination 2
04.07.1989 Claims Search / examination 2
04.07.1989 Description Search / examination 8
04.07.1989 Description Search / examination 10
04.07.1989 Reply to communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 2
06.03.1989 Communication from the Examining Division Search / examination 4
23.06.1987 Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment Search / examination 2
07.05.1987 Notification of forthcoming publication Search / examination 1
31.03.1987 Refund of (partial) search fee Search / examination 1
16.03.1987 Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report Search / examination 1
16.03.1987 European search report Search / examination 2
04.11.1986 Abstract Search / examination 1
04.11.1986 Claims Search / examination 2
04.11.1986 Description Search / examination 9
04.11.1986 Designation of inventor Search / examination 1
04.11.1986 Drawings Search / examination 6
04.11.1986 Letter concerning search matters Search / examination 2
04.11.1986 Priority document Search / examination 11
04.11.1986 Request for grant of a European patent Search / examination 10