blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0235494

EP0235494 - Active tactile sensor apparatus and method [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  14.12.1989
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE
505 King Avenue
Columbus, OH 43201-2693 / US
[N/P]
Former [1987/37]For all designated states
BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE
505 King Avenue
Columbus Ohio 43201-2693 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Dvorsky, James E.
3567 Braidwood Drive
Colombus Ohio 43220 / US
02 / Kelley, Brian A.
6303 Hollins Drive
Bethesda Maryland 20817 / US
03 / McCown, Robert B
4262 Clairmont Road
Columbus Ohio 43220 / US
04 / Renner, Frederick G.
1824 Hess Boulevard
Columbus Ohio 43212 / US
[1987/37]
Representative(s)Dousse, Blasco, et al
73, Avenue de Mategin
1217 Meyrin-Genève / CH
[N/P]
Former [1987/37]Dousse, Blasco, et al
7, route de Drize
CH-1227 Carouge/Genève / CH
Application number, filing date86810097.526.02.1986
[1987/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0235494
Date:09.09.1987
Language:EN
[1987/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.11.1986
ClassificationIPC:G01L1/16, G01L5/22
[1987/37]
CPC:
G01B7/004 (EP,US); G01L1/16 (EP,US); G01L5/228 (EP,US);
H10N30/302 (EP,US); A61F2002/7635 (EP,US); Y10S310/80 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1987/37]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung und Verfahren für einen aktiven taktilen Sensor[1987/37]
English:Active tactile sensor apparatus and method[1987/37]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour capteur tactile actif[1987/37]
File destroyed:25.07.1995
Examination procedure25.01.1988Examination requested  [1988/13]
21.10.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.02.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.03.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
17.04.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.07.1989Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1990/05]
29.08.1989Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time  [1990/05]
Fees paidRenewal fee
18.02.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
20.02.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2122746  (MARCONI CO LTD);
 [X]US4555953  (DARIO PAOLO [IT], et al)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.