blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0207013

EP0207013 - Method and apparatus for guiding a billet into a pressure-piercing rolling mill [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  03.04.1990
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip17.04.2015Change - lapse in a contracting statepublished on 20.05.2015  [2015/21]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
INNSE INNOCENTI SANTEUSTACCHIO S.p.A.
20, Via A. Franchi
I-25127 Brescia / IT
[1986/52]
Inventor(s)01 / Gancia, Emanuele
Via Morosini, 23
I-20135 Milan / IT
[1986/52]
Representative(s)Perani, Aurelio, et al
c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A Via Senato 8
20121 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1986/52]Perani, Aurelio, et al
c/o JACOBACCI & PERANI S.p.A Via Visconti di Modrone, 7
I-20122 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date86830168.016.06.1986
[1986/52]
Priority number, dateIT1985002133128.06.1985         Original published format: IT 2133185
[1986/52]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0207013
Date:30.12.1986
Language:EN
[1986/52]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0207013
Date:13.05.1987
Language:EN
[1987/20]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0207013
Date:24.05.1989
Language:EN
[1989/21]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.03.1987
ClassificationIPC:B21B39/06
[1986/52]
CPC:
B21B39/06 (EP,US); B21B17/08 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   SE [1986/52]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Führung eines Knüppels in ein Lochwalzgerät[1986/52]
English:Method and apparatus for guiding a billet into a pressure-piercing rolling mill[1986/52]
French:Procédé et dispositif pour le guidage d'une billette dans un laminoir perceur[1986/52]
File destroyed:15.01.2000
Examination procedure22.05.1987Examination requested  [1987/33]
08.06.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
28.09.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
19.10.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
29.11.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
13.01.1989Fee for grant paid
13.01.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)27.02.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1990/21]
Fees paidRenewal fee
17.05.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Former [1989/39]BE30.06.1989
Documents cited:Search[A]DE2805708  (INNOCENTI SANTEUSTACCHIO SPA);
 [X]GB2114485  (INNOCENTI SANTEUSTACCHIO SPA)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.