blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0227618

EP0227618 - A moisture contents detector for a sizing machine [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  02.06.1994
Database last updated on 15.06.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip02.06.1994No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 20.07.1994 [1994/29]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TSUDAKOMA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
18-18, Nomachi 5-chome Kanazawa-shi
Ishikawa-ken / JP
[N/P]
Former [1987/27]For all designated states
TSUDAKOMA KOGYO KABUSHIKI KAISHA
18-18, Nomachi 5-chome
Kanazawa-shi Ishikawa-Ken / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Nakade, Kiyoshi
Ro 107, Kamimaki-machi
Komatsu-shi Ishikawa-ken / JP
[1987/27]
Representative(s)Ström, Tore, et al
Ström & Gulliksson AB P.O. Box 4188
203 13 Malmö / SE
[N/P]
Former [1987/27]Ström, Tore, et al
Ström & Gulliksson AB Studentgatan 1 P.O. Box 4188
S-203 13 Malmö / SE
Application number, filing date86850408.526.11.1986
[1987/27]
Priority number, dateJP1985026645926.11.1985         Original published format: JP 26645985
[1987/27]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0227618
Date:01.07.1987
Language:EN
[1987/27]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0227618
Date:07.02.1990
Language:EN
[1990/06]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0227618
Date:28.07.1993
Language:EN
[1993/30]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP21.12.1989
ClassificationIPC:G01N21/35, D06B23/24
[1987/27]
CPC:
D06B23/26 (EP); G01N21/3554 (EP); G01N21/3559 (EP)
Designated contracting statesCH,   DE,   FR,   IT,   LI [1987/27]
TitleGerman:Feuchtegradmesser für eine Schlichtmaschine[1987/27]
English:A moisture contents detector for a sizing machine[1987/27]
French:Détecteur d'humidité pour une machine encolleuse[1987/27]
Examination procedure21.07.1990Examination requested  [1990/37]
12.09.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
28.02.1992Reply to a communication from the examining division
12.10.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
03.02.1993Communication of intention to grant the patent
15.03.1993Fee for grant paid
15.03.1993Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)29.04.1994No opposition filed within time limit [1994/29]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.11.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
25.11.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
23.11.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
23.11.1991Renewal fee patent year 06
20.11.1992Renewal fee patent year 07
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2155270  ;
 [A]GB2020423  ;
 [A]US4171107  ;
 [A]EP0137696
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.