blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0222738

EP0222738 - Process for the production of a transmission mask [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  11.07.1990
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
IMS Ionen Mikrofabrikations Systeme Gesellschaft m.b.H.
Schreygasse 3
A-1020 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [1987/21]For all designated states
IMS Ionen Mikrofabrikations Systeme Gesellschaft m.b.H.
Schreygasse 3
A-1020 Wien / AT
Inventor(s)01 / Löschner, Hans, Dr.
Vegagasse 6/2
A-1190 Wien / AT
02 / Stengl, Gerhard, Dr.
Hammergasse 11
A-9500 Villach Kärnten / AT
[1987/21]
Representative(s)Krause, Ernst, et al
Dipl.- Ing. Krause, Ernst Dipl. Ing. Casati, Wilhelm Patentanwälte Amerlingstrasse 8
1061 Wien / AT
[N/P]
Former [1987/21]Krause, Ernst, Dipl.-Ing., et al
Dipl.- Ing. Krause, Ernst Dipl. Ing. Casati, Wilhelm Patentanwälte Amerlingstrasse 8
A-1061 Wien / AT
Application number, filing date86890316.213.11.1986
[1987/21]
Priority number, dateAT1985000331213.11.1985         Original published format: AT 331285
[1987/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0222738
Date:20.05.1987
Language:DE
[1987/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0222738
Date:12.07.1989
Language:DE
[1989/28]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP23.05.1989
ClassificationIPC:G03F1/00
[1987/21]
CPC:
G03F1/20 (EP,US); Y10S430/167 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   NL,   SE [1987/21]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung einer Transmissionsmaske[1987/21]
English:Process for the production of a transmission mask[1987/21]
French:Procédé de fabrication d'un masque par transmission[1987/21]
File destroyed:28.01.1999
Examination procedure13.01.1990Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1990/35]
04.04.1990Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1990/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
11.11.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
Penalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
08.02.1990M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
30.11.198904   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[X]EP0019779  (IBM [US]);
 [A]DE3009579  (FISCHER ALBRECHT G PROF DR [DE])
 [X]  - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, Band 21, Nr. 2, Juli 1978, New YorkUS; R. HAMMER et al.: "Fabricating rib-supported vacuum deposition masks out of metal"
 [A]  - JOURNAL OF VACUUM SCIENCE & TECHNOLOGY/B, Band 3, Nr. 1, Januar-Februar 1985, Seiten 58-61, American Vacuum Society, WoodburyUS; J.N. RANDALL et al.: "Masked ion beam resist exposure using grid support stencil masks"
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.