blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0214191

EP0214191 - PROTECTIVE SCREEN FOR WASTE MATTER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusOpposition rejected
Status updated on  22.06.1993
Database last updated on 17.05.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip05.10.2005Change: Appeal number 
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Bilfinger + Berger Bauaktiengesellschaft
Carl-Reiss-Platz 1-5
68165 Mannheim / DE
For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/12]For all designated states
Bilfinger + Berger Bauaktiengesellschaft
Carl-Reiss-Platz 1-5
D-68165 Mannheim / DE
For all designated states
BASF Aktiengesellschaft
Carl-Bosch-Strasse 38
D-67063 Ludwigshafen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / BRÜGGEMANN, Heinrich
Heidelberger Strasse 7
D-6945 Hirschberg / DE
02 / HERZHAUSER, Manfred
Tiroler Strasse 32
D-6700 Ludwigshafen/Rhein / DE
03 / KOCHENDOERFER, Gottfried
Am Kirschberg 5
D-6719 Weisenheim am Berg / DE
04 / KRUBASIK, Klaus
Hammelstalstrasse 11
D-6702 Bad Dürkheim / DE
[1987/12]
Representative(s)Ratzel, Gerhard
Seckenheimer Strasse 36a
68165 Mannheim / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/12]Ratzel, Gerhard, Dr.
Seckenheimer Strasse 36a
D-68165 Mannheim / DE
Application number, filing date86901341.717.02.1986
[1987/12]
WO1986DE00058
Priority number, dateDE1985350568719.02.1985         Original published format: DE 3505687
[1987/12]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report
No.:WO8604943
Date:28.08.1986
Language:DE
[1986/19]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0214191
Date:18.03.1987
Language:DE
The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.08.1986 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application.
[1987/12]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0214191
Date:11.10.1989
Language:DE
[1989/41]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP28.08.1986
ClassificationIPC:E02D31/00, B09B1/00
[1987/12]
CPC:
E02D31/004 (EP,US); B09B1/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1987/12]
TitleGerman:ABDICHTUNGSSCHIRM FÜR DEPONIEN[1987/12]
English:PROTECTIVE SCREEN FOR WASTE MATTER[1987/12]
French:ECRAN DE PROTECTION POUR DECHETS[1987/12]
Entry into regional phase06.11.1986National basic fee paid 
06.11.1986Designation fee(s) paid 
13.02.1987Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.02.1987Examination requested  [1987/16]
15.03.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
10.09.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
27.02.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
04.04.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.06.1989Fee for grant paid
01.06.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  11.07.1990  18.09.1990  ADMISSIBLE
Ed. Züblin AG
Albstadtweg 3
7000 Stuttgart 80 / US
Opponent's representative
Jackisch, Walter
Menzelstrasse 40
D-70192 Stuttgart / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1990/37]
Opponent(s)01  11.07.1990  18.09.1990  ADMISSIBLE
Ed. Züblin AG
Albstadtweg 3
7000 Stuttgart 80 / US
Opponent's representative
Jackisch, Walter, Dipl.-Ing.
Menzelstrasse 40
D-70192 Stuttgart / DE
21.09.1990Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
23.01.1991Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
05.09.1991Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
15.09.1991Legal effect of rejection of opposition [1993/32]
Appeal following opposition26.10.1991Appeal received No.  T0842/91
13.01.1992Statement of grounds filed
11.05.1993Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected
11.05.1993Date of oral proceedings
26.05.1993Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.01.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
16.12.1988Renewal fee patent year 04
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipSE11.10.1989
CH28.02.1990
LI28.02.1990
[1993/03]
Former [1991/09]SE11.10.1989
CH28.02.1990
LI28.02.1990
Former [1990/21]SE11.10.1989
Cited inInternational searchEP0130773  [ ] (ROLLINS ENVIRONMENTAL SERVICES [US]);
 DE3415729  [ ] (NEUHAUS HANS ULRICH DIPL ING);
 DE3041706  [ ] (WESTFAEL ELEKT WERKE [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.