Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0217866

EP0217866 - ELECTRONIC THERMOMETER [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.11.1990
Database last updated on 20.05.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.1990No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.01.1991 [1991/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NCR CORPORATION
World Headquarters
Dayton, Ohio 45479 / US
[1987/16]
Inventor(s)01 / PACKARD, Roger, Erwin
7175 Rip Tide Circle
Huntington Beach, CA 92648 / US
02 / THOMAS, Jacob, Earl
101 Park Lane
Ithaca, NY 14850 / US
[1987/16]
Representative(s)Robinson, Robert George
International Intellectual Property Department, NCR Limited, 206 Marylebone Road
London NW1 6LY / GB
[N/P]
Former [1987/16]Robinson, Robert George
International Patent Department NCR Limited 206 Marylebone Road
London NW1 6LY / GB
Application number, filing date86902219.424.03.1986
[1987/16]
WO1986US00581
Priority number, dateUS1985072172410.04.1985         Original published format: US 721724
[1987/16]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO8606162
Date:23.10.1986
Language:EN
[1986/23]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0217866
Date:15.04.1987
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.1986
[1987/16]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0217866
Date:31.01.1990
Language:EN
[1990/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:EP23.10.1986
ClassificationInternational:G01K1/02, G01K3/00, G01K13/00
[1987/16]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1987/16]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRONISCHES THERMOMETER[1987/16]
English:ELECTRONIC THERMOMETER[1987/16]
French:THERMOMETRE ELECTRONIQUE[1987/16]
File destroyed:12.06.1999
Entry into regional phase05.12.1986National basic fee paid 
05.12.1986Designation fee(s) paid 
15.04.1987Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure15.04.1987Examination requested  [1987/25]
27.02.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
10.06.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
18.07.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
01.08.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
01.09.1989Fee for grant paid
01.09.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.11.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1991/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
14.03.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
16.03.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[ ]EP0025653
 [ ]EP0128283
 [ ]US4176556
 [ ]DE2515635
 [ ]GB2148010
 [A]JPS57169636
 [X]  Medical & Biological Engineering & Computing, No. 5, 22 September 1984, Staines, Middlesex, (GB) T. TAMURA et al.: "Design of a Multichannel Solid State Recorder and its Application to Temperature Measurement", pages 411-417, see the whole document
 [A]  PATENTS ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, Volume 7, No. 15 (P-169) (1160), 21 January 1983 & JP, A, 57169636 (Matsushita Denko K.K.) 19 October 1982