Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0229818

EP0229818 - ELECTRONIC LOCKING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  22.11.1990
Database last updated on 26.06.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip22.11.1990No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 09.01.1991 [1991/02]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
AB VOLVO
S-405 08 Göteborg / SE
[1989/37]
Former [1987/31]For all designated states
AB VOLVO PENTA
S-40508 Göteborg / SE
Inventor(s)01 / HAGBERG, Anders, Peter, Gösta
Klarinettvägen
S-434 00 Kungsbacka / SE
02 / KNUTSSON, Evan, Albert
Dr Forselius gata 58
S-413 26 Göteborg / SE
03 / NYSTRÖM, Mats, Olof, Gunnar
Studiegangen
S-416 81 Göteborg / SE
[1987/31]
Representative(s)Ferkinghoff, Claes-Göran , et al
AWAPATENT AB, Södra Hamngatan 37-41, P.O. Box 11394
404 28 Göteborg / SE
[N/P]
Former [1987/31]Ferkinghoff, Claes-Göran , et al
AWAPATENT AB, Södra Hamngatan 37-41, P.O. Box 11394
S-404 28 Göteborg / SE
Application number, filing date86904441.227.06.1986
[1987/31]
WO1986SE00316
Priority number, dateSE1985000325701.07.1985         Original published format: SE 8503257
[1987/31]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1  Application with search report
No.:WO8700234
Date:15.01.1987
Language:EN
[1987/01]
Type: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0229818
Date:29.07.1987
Language:EN
The application has been published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 15.01.1987
[1987/31]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0229818
Date:31.01.1990
Language:EN
[1990/05]
Search report(s)International search report - published on:SE15.01.1987
ClassificationInternational:E05B49/00, B60R25/00, E05B65/12
[1987/31]
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1987/31]
TitleGerman:ELEKTRONISCHES VERRIEGELUNGSSYSTEM[1987/31]
English:ELECTRONIC LOCKING SYSTEM[1987/31]
French:SYSTEME DE VERROUILLAGE ELECTRONIQUE[1987/31]
Entry into regional phase11.03.1987National basic fee paid 
11.03.1987Designation fee(s) paid 
13.07.1987Examination fee paid 
Examination procedure13.07.1987Examination requested  [1987/37]
23.12.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
13.04.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
09.06.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
02.08.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
24.10.1989Fee for grant paid
24.10.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)01.11.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1991/02]
Fees paidRenewal fee
22.06.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
10.05.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
Cited inInternational search[Y]DE2928913
 [Y]EP0010084
 [Y]DE2906665
 [Y]DE3005890
 [Y]US4274080
 [Y]GB2069207