blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0234300

EP0234300 - Method and apparatus for making hollow articles from thermoplastic material [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  21.03.1990
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip28.11.2003Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 14.01.2004  [2004/03]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Krupp Corpoplast Maschinenbau GmbH.
Postfach 73 03 40, Meiendorfer Strasse 203
D-22123 Hamburg / DE
[1987/36]
Inventor(s)01 / Albrecht, Peter
Sülzbrackring 1
D-2050 Hamburg 80 / DE
02 / Reymann, Wolfgang
Groten Hoff 15
D-2000 Hamburg 67 / DE
03 / Vogel, Klaus
Rütersberg 4 a
D-2000 Barsbüttel / DE
04 / Werner, Hermann
Kirchenredder 4
D-2000 Hamburg 63 / DE
[1987/36]
Representative(s)Koepsell, Helmut
Frankenforster Strasse 135-137
51427 Bergisch Gladbach / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/36]Koepsell, Helmut, Dipl.-Ing.
Mittelstrasse 7
D-50672 Köln / DE
Application number, filing date87101022.926.01.1987
[1987/36]
Priority number, dateDE1986360384307.02.1986         Original published format: DE 3603843
[1987/36]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0234300
Date:02.09.1987
Language:DE
[1987/36]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0234300
Date:10.05.1989
Language:DE
[1989/19]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.07.1987
ClassificationIPC:B29C55/30, B29C53/20
[1987/36]
CPC:
B29C55/30 (EP,US); B29C53/20 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1987/36]
TitleGerman:Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Herstellen von Hohlkörpern aus thermoplastischem Kunststoff[1987/36]
English:Method and apparatus for making hollow articles from thermoplastic material[1987/36]
French:Procédé et dispositif de fabrication de corps creux en matière thermoplastique[1987/36]
Examination procedure25.11.1987Examination requested  [1988/04]
18.05.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
11.08.1988Reply to a communication from the examining division
23.09.1988Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.11.1988Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.02.1989Fee for grant paid
08.02.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)13.02.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1990/19]
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.01.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE10.05.1989
GB10.05.1989
GR10.05.1989
NL10.05.1989
SE10.05.1989
ES21.08.1989
AT26.01.1990
CH31.01.1990
LI31.01.1990
LU31.01.1990
[2004/03]
Former [2000/04]BE10.05.1989
GB10.05.1989
GR10.05.1989
NL10.05.1989
SE10.05.1989
AT26.01.1990
CH31.01.1990
LI31.01.1990
LU31.01.1990
Former [1999/52]BE10.05.1989
GB10.05.1989
NL10.05.1989
SE10.05.1989
AT26.01.1990
CH31.01.1990
LI31.01.1990
LU31.01.1990
Former [1991/42]BE10.05.1989
GB10.05.1989
NL10.05.1989
SE10.05.1989
AT26.01.1990
CH31.01.1990
LI31.01.1990
Former [1991/08]BE10.05.1989
GB10.05.1989
NL10.05.1989
SE10.05.1989
CH31.01.1990
LI31.01.1990
Former [1990/42]GB10.05.1989
NL10.05.1989
SE10.05.1989
Former [1990/11]NL10.05.1989
SE10.05.1989
Former [1989/36]SE10.05.1989
Documents cited:Search[A]GB626863  (BASHESHAR NATH SIKKA, et al);
 [A]GB1352002  (SUPER CARTRIDGE CO PTY LTD);
 [A]US4065951  (LYU SEUNG W);
 [A]FR2534519  (PLM AB [SE]);
 [A]WO8600565  (PETAINER SA [CH])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.