blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0232801

EP0232801 - Device for closing quarters, particularly for ski boots [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  10.07.1993
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip22.06.1994Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): AT
published on 10.08.1994 [1994/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
NORDICA S.p.A.
Via Montebelluna 5/7
31040 Trevignano (Treviso) / IT
[N/P]
Former [1990/45]For all designated states
NORDICA S.p.A.
Via Montebelluna 5/7
I-31040 Trevignano (Treviso) / IT
Former [1987/34]For all designated states
NORDICA S.p.A
Via Montebelluna 5/7
I-31040 Trevignano (Treviso) / IT
Inventor(s)01 / Baggio, Giorgio
Via Lamarmora, 30
UI-35018 S. Martino di Lupari Padova / IT
02 / Sartor, Mariano
Via Barile, 8
I-31044 Montebelluna Treviso / IT
[1992/37]
Former [1987/34]01 / Baggio, Giorgio
Via Lamarmora, 30
UI-35018 S. Martino di Lupari Padova / IT
02 / Sartor, Mariano
Via Barile, 8
I-35044 Montebelluna Treviso / IT
Representative(s)Modiano, Guido, et al
Dr. Modiano & Associati SpA Via Meravigli, 16
20123 Milano / IT
[N/P]
Former [1987/34]Modiano, Guido, Dr.-Ing., et al
Modiano & Associati S.r.l. Via Meravigli, 16
I-20123 Milano / IT
Application number, filing date87101168.028.01.1987
[1987/34]
Priority number, dateIT19860020871U06.02.1986         Original published format: IT 2087186 U
[1987/34]
Filing languageIT
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0232801
Date:19.08.1987
Language:EN
[1987/34]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0232801
Date:15.11.1989
Language:EN
[1989/46]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0232801
Date:09.09.1992
Language:EN
[1992/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP26.09.1989
ClassificationIPC:A43C11/00
[1987/34]
CPC:
A43C11/00 (EP,US); A43C11/16 (EP,US); Y10T24/2183 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesAT,   CH,   DE,   FR,   IT,   LI [1987/34]
TitleGerman:Vorrichtung zum Schliessen der Oberteile von Schischuhen[1987/34]
English:Device for closing quarters, particularly for ski boots[1987/34]
French:Dispositif de fermeture de quartiers, en particulier de chaussures de ski[1987/34]
Examination procedure06.12.1989Examination requested  [1990/09]
17.06.1991Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
24.10.1991Reply to a communication from the examining division
10.12.1991Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
10.03.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
09.05.1992Fee for grant paid
09.05.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)10.06.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1993/35]
Fees paidRenewal fee
19.12.1988Renewal fee patent year 03
16.12.1989Renewal fee patent year 04
17.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
18.12.1991Renewal fee patent year 06
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Lapses during opposition  TooltipAT28.01.1993
CH31.01.1993
LI31.01.1993
[1994/32]
Former [1994/04]CH31.01.1993
LI31.01.1993
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3201702  (NORDICA SPA [IT]);
 [A]EP0146502  (RAICHLE SPORTSCHUH AG [CH]);
 [A]DE3406591  (LEDERER JOSEF)
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.