Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0235606

EP0235606 - Securing an endoprosthesis for an acetabular cup in a bed of bone cement [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  13.04.1991
Database last updated on 18.03.2019
Most recent event   Tooltip13.04.1991No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 05.06.1991 [1991/23]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Gebrüder Sulzer Aktiengesellschaft
Zürcherstrasse 9
CH-8401 Winterthur / CH
For all designated states
Protek AG
Stadtbachstrasse 64
3001 Bern / CH
[N/P]
Former [1987/37]For all designated states
GEBRÜDER SULZER AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT
Zürcherstrasse 9
CH-8401 Winterthur / CH
For all designated states
Protek AG
Stadtbachstrasse 64
CH-3001 Bern / CH
Inventor(s)01 / Müller, Maurice E., Prof.Dr.-med.
Melchenbühlweg 9
CH-3006 Bern / CH
[1987/37]
Representative(s)Sparing Röhl Henseler
Postfach 14 04 43
40074 Düsseldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/49]Sparing Röhl Henseler Patentanwälte
Postfach 14 04 43
D-40074 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [1987/37]Dipl.-Ing. H. Marsch Dipl.-Ing. K. Sparing Dipl.-Phys.Dr. W.H. Röhl Patentanwälte
Rethelstrasse 123
D-4000 Düsseldorf 1 / DE
Application number, filing date87101571.505.02.1987
[1987/37]
Priority number, dateCH1986000065218.02.1986         Original published format: CH 65286
[1987/37]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0235606
Date:09.09.1987
Language:DE
[1987/37]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0235606
Date:13.06.1990
Language:DE
[1990/24]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP14.07.1987
ClassificationInternational:A61F2/34
[1987/37]
Designated contracting statesAT,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1987/37]
TitleGerman:In einem Knochenzementbett zu verankernde Endoprothese für eine Hüftgelenkspfanne[1987/37]
English:Securing an endoprosthesis for an acetabular cup in a bed of bone cement[1987/37]
French:Fixation d'une endoprothèse pour une cupule acétabulaire dans une couche de ciment osseux[1987/37]
Examination procedure22.02.1988Examination requested  [1988/16]
10.11.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
06.12.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
05.03.1990Fee for grant paid
05.03.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)14.03.1991No opposition filed within time limit [1991/23]
Fees paidRenewal fee
10.02.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
14.02.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
Documents cited:Search[XP]DE8623855U  ;
 [A]US4566138  (LEWIS EDWARD L [US], et al);
 [A]EP0153523  (HOWMEDICA [IE]);
 [A]FR2215927  (LOUYOT COMPTOIR LYON ALEMAND [FR])