blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0237788

EP0237788 - Ink-jet printing media containing macrocyclic polyethers [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application is deemed to be withdrawn
Status updated on  19.09.1989
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip15.08.2008Change - applicantpublished on 17.09.2008  [2008/38]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US
[N/P]
Former [2008/38]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US
Former [1987/39]For all designated states
Hewlett-Packard Company
P.O. Box 10301 3000 Hanover Street
Palo Alto California 94303-0890 / US
Inventor(s)01 / Miller, Robert James
1424 Balboa Avenue
Burlingame, CA 94010 / US
[1987/39]
Representative(s)Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB
Gropiusplatz 10
70563 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/39]KOHLER SCHMID + PARTNER
Patentanwälte Ruppmannstrasse 27
D-70565 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date87101965.912.02.1987
[1987/39]
Priority number, dateUS1986084228421.03.1986         Original published format: US 842284
[1987/39]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0237788
Date:23.09.1987
Language:EN
[1987/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0237788
Date:03.08.1988
Language:EN
[1988/31]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP15.06.1988
ClassificationIPC:C09D11/00
[1987/39]
CPC:
C09D11/328 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1987/39]
TitleGerman:Tintenstrahldruckflüssigkeiten, die makrocyclische Polyether enthalten[1987/39]
English:Ink-jet printing media containing macrocyclic polyethers[1987/39]
French:Véhicules d'impression par jet d'encre contenant des polyéthers macrocycliques[1987/39]
File destroyed:12.05.1995
Examination procedure04.02.1989Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect  [1989/45]
15.06.1989Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time  [1989/45]
Fees paidPenalty fee
Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973
18.04.1989M01   Not yet paid
Additional fee for renewal fee
28.02.198903   M06   Not yet paid
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]DE3410855  ;
 [X]JPS52148308  ;
 [X]JPS52148307
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 88, no. 22, 29th May 1978, page 107, abstract no. 154531c, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-77 148 308 (SAILOR PEN CO.LTD) 09-12-1977
 [X]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 88, no. 22, 29th May 1978, page 107, abstract no. 154532d, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-77 148 307 (SAILOR PEN CO.LTD) 09-12-1977
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.