blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0235820

EP0235820 - Paper-like polyester fiber printing sheet [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusThe application has been withdrawn
Status updated on  08.03.1990
Database last updated on 22.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip07.07.2007Change - inventorpublished on 08.08.2007  [2007/32]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
TEIJIN LIMITED
11, Minamihonmachi 1-chome Higashi-ku Osaka-shi
Osaka 541 / JP
[N/P]
Former [1987/37]For all designated states
TEIJIN LIMITED
11, Minamihonmachi 1-chome Higashi-ku
Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP
Inventor(s)01 / Takanori, Shinoki
1-2, Yato Ohara
Kawanishi-shi Hyogo / JP
[1987/37]
Representative(s)Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner Patentanwälte mbB
Uhlandstrasse 14c
70182 Stuttgart / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/37]Hoeger, Stellrecht & Partner
Uhlandstrasse 14 c
D-70182 Stuttgart / DE
Application number, filing date87103161.305.03.1987
[1987/37]
Priority number, dateJP1986004737206.03.1986         Original published format: JP 4737286
JP1986009200023.04.1986         Original published format: JP 9200086
[1987/37]
Filing languageEN
Procedural languageEN
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0235820
Date:09.09.1987
Language:EN
[1987/37]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP30.06.1987
ClassificationIPC:D21H5/20, B41M1/36
[1987/37]
CPC:
D21H13/24 (EP); B41M5/508 (EP)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB [1987/37]
TitleGerman:Papierähnliches Druckblatt aus Polyesterfasern[1987/37]
English:Paper-like polyester fiber printing sheet[1987/37]
French:Feuille d'impression semblable au papier à base de fibres de polyester[1987/37]
File destroyed:24.06.1996
Examination procedure23.09.1987Examination requested  [1987/47]
28.11.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08)
12.07.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.10.1989Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
20.02.1990Application withdrawn by applicant  [1990/17]
Fees paidRenewal fee
23.03.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]JP60038193  ;
 [A]GB2106148  ;
 [A]US3223581  ;
 [A]EP0043555
 [A]  - ABSTRACT BULLETIN OF THE INSTITUTE OF PAPER CHEMISTRY, vol. 56, no. 9, March 1986, page 1136, abstract no. 10349, Appleton, Wisconsin, US; & JP-A-60 038193 (KURARAY CO.) 27-02-1985, & JP60038193 A 00000000
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.