blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability
Register Forum

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News flashes

New version of the European Patent Register - SPC information for Unitary Patents.

2024-03-06

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0237889

EP0237889 - Two-component package [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  09.04.1992
Database last updated on 17.07.2024
Most recent event   Tooltip09.04.1992No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 27.05.1992 [1992/22]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Robert Finke GmbH & Co. KG
Baumschulweg 12
57413 Finnentrop / DE
[N/P]
Former [1991/09]For all designated states
Robert Finke GmbH & Co. KG
Baumschulweg 12
D-57413 Finnentrop / DE
Former [1987/39]For all designated states
Robert Finke Kommanditgesellschaft
Baumschulweg 12
D-5950 Finnentrop 12 / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Finke, Robert Günter
Zur Fielbecke 21
D-5950 Finnentrop / DE
02 / Schumacher, Clemens
Grimmestrasse 12
D-5768 Sundern 1 / DE
[1987/39]
Representative(s)Rieder, Hans-Joachim
Rieder & Partner mbB
Patentanwälte - Rechtsanwalt
Postfach 11 04 51
42304 Wuppertal / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/39]Rieder, Hans-Joachim, Dr.
Rieder & Partner Anwaltskanzlei Postfach 11 04 51
D-42304 Wuppertal / DE
Application number, filing date87103235.506.03.1987
[1987/39]
Priority number, dateDE19860006940U13.03.1986         Original published format: DE 8606940 U
[1987/39]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0237889
Date:23.09.1987
Language:DE
[1987/39]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0237889
Date:21.09.1988
Language:DE
[1988/38]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0237889
Date:05.06.1991
Language:DE
[1991/23]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP04.08.1988
ClassificationIPC:B65D51/28
[1987/39]
CPC:
B65D51/2885 (EP,US); Y10S215/08 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesBE,   CH,   DE,   FR,   GB,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL [1987/39]
TitleGerman:Zwei-Komponenten-Packung[1987/39]
English:Two-component package[1987/39]
French:Emballage de deux composants[1987/39]
Examination procedure24.04.1987Fee for publishing/printing paid
08.09.1988Examination requested  [1988/44]
21.02.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
15.06.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
26.07.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
16.08.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
08.10.1990Fee for grant paid
Opposition(s)06.03.1992No opposition filed within time limit [1992/22]
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.01.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
08.03.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
07.03.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[A]FR2453793  (OREAL);
 [A]FR2370650  (OREAL [FR]);
 [AD]EP0133293  (FINKE ROBERT KG [DE])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.