Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE64501T | 15.06.1991 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE3617476 | 23.05.1986 | DE3632077 | 20.09.1986 | EP87106546 | 06.05.1987 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3770696D1 | 18.07.1991 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE3770696 | 06.05.1987 | DE3617476 | 23.05.1986 | DE3632077 | 20.09.1986 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2515332B | 10.07.1996 | B2 | JPS6326012 | 03.02.1988 | A | Priority number | Date | DE3617476 | 23.05.1986 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0247399 | ![]() | 12.06.1991 | B1 | EP0247399 | 02.12.1987 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3617476 | 23.05.1986 | DE3632077 | 20.09.1986 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE3632077 | 26.11.1987 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE3617476 | 23.05.1986 | DE3632077 | 20.09.1986 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2023644 | 01.02.1992 | B3 | Priority number | Date | DE3617476 | 23.05.1986 | DE3632077 | 20.09.1986 |