Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP Legal status: EP0247399

Designated contracting states AT 
 BE 
 CH 
 DE 
 ES 
FR 
GB 
 IT 
 LI 
 LU 
 NL 
 SE 
Examination procedure15.12.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
Fees paidRenewal fee
07.07.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
12.04.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
11.12.1990Renewal fee patent year 05
Penalty fee
Additional fee for renewal fee
31.05.198903   M06   Fee paid on   07.07.1989
European patent granted12.06.1991
Opposition procedure13.03.1992No opposition filed within time limit published on 03.06.1992 
INPADOC data   TooltipThe EPO does not accept any responsibility for the accuracy of legal status data relating to the post-grant phase, including but not limited to their completeness and fitness for specific purposes, nor can it guarantee that such data are up to date. For authoritative information, please refer to the relevant national patent authority.
Event date:12.07.1991 
Event description:FR: TRANSLATION FILED
 
Event date:17.07.1991 
Event description:GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)
 
Event date:03.06.1992 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED
 
Event date:28.10.1992 
Event description:LU: LAST PAID ANNUAL FEE
 
Event date:17.01.1994 
Event description:NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE
 
Event date:02.12.1987 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:A1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE
 
Event date:12.06.1991 
Event description:DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES
Kind Code of Ref Document:B1
Designated State(s):AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE
 
Event date:17.02.1988 
Event description:REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED
Effective DATE:19871218
 
Event date:16.05.1990 
Event description:FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED
Effective DATE:19900404
 
Event date:05.06.1991 
Event description:IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED
 
Event date:12.06.1991 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:64501
Country of Ref Document:AT
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:19910615
Kind Code of Ref Document:T
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:18.07.1991 
Event description:CORRESPONDS TO:
Ref Document Number:3770696
Country of Ref Document:DE
DATE OF REF DOCUMENT:19910718
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:30.12.1998 
Event description:GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE
Effective DATE:19980506
 
Event date:01.02.1992 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FG2A 2023644 ES B3
Code Expl.:+DEFINITIVE PROTECTION
Format of Ref Document F/P:P
 
Event date:31.01.1994 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG CH PL
Code Expl.:-PATENT CEASED
 
Event date:03.09.1997 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG GB 746
Code Expl.: REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)
Effective DATE:19970808
 
Event date:05.03.1999 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG FR ST
Code Expl.:-NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE
 
Event date:01.08.2000 
Event description:REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE
Event code:REG ES FD2A
Code Expl.:-ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN
Effective DATE:20000601
 
Event date:03.02.1988 
Event description:PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED)
OWNER:DEUTSCHE THOMSON-BRANDT GMBH
 
Event date:30.11.1993 
Event description:BE: LAPSED
OWNER:DEUTSCHE THOMSON-BRANDT G.M.B.H.
Effective DATE:19930531
 
Event date:31.01.1995 
Event description:SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED
Ref Document Number:87106546.2
Effective DATE:19931210
Format of Ref Document F/P:F
 
Event date:06.05.1993 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Effective DATE:19930506
 
Event date:31.05.1993 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Effective DATE:19930531
 
Event date:31.05.1993 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Effective DATE:19930531
 
Event date:02.03.1999 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:19990302
 
Event date:07.05.1998 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION
Effective DATE:19980507
 
Event date:31.05.1998 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:19980531
 
Event date:06.05.1998 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:19980506
 
Event date:31.05.1993 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LI
Effective DATE:19930531
 
Event date:06.05.1993 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES
Effective DATE:19930506
 
Event date:01.12.1993 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Effective DATE:19931201
 
Event date:07.05.1993 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Effective DATE:19930507
 
Event date:15.05.1992 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:AT
Payment DATE:19920515
Year of Fee Payment:06
 
Event date:14.05.1992 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:BE
Payment DATE:19920514
Year of Fee Payment:06
 
Event date:20.08.1992 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:CH
Payment DATE:19920820
Year of Fee Payment:06
 
Event date:23.07.1997 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:DE
Payment DATE:19970723
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:31.05.1997 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:ES
Payment DATE:19970531
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:23.05.1997 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:FR
Payment DATE:19970523
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:22.04.1997 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:GB
Payment DATE:19970422
Year of Fee Payment:11
 
Event date:23.04.1992 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:LU
Payment DATE:19920423
Year of Fee Payment:06
 
Event date:31.05.1992 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:NL
Payment DATE:19920531
Year of Fee Payment:06
 
Event date:21.05.1992 
Event description:ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:SE
Payment DATE:19920521
Year of Fee Payment:06
 
Event date:06.05.2005 
Event description:LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO]
Ref Country Code:IT
Free Format Text:LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES;WARNING: LAPSES OF ITALIAN PATENTS WITH EFFECTIVE DATE BEFORE 2007 MAY HAVE OCCURRED AT ANY TIME BEFORE 2007. THE CORRECT EFFECTIVE DATE MAY BE DIFFERENT FROM THE ONE RECORDED.
Effective DATE:20050506
 
Event date:26.04.1991 
Event description:(EXPECTED) GRANT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210
 
Event date:17.10.1987 
Event description:PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012
 
Event date:16.04.1992 
Event description:INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT
Free Format Text:STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
 
Event date:16.04.1992 
Event description:NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT
Free Format Text:ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261