Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0289639

EP0289639 - Use of trigonellin to revive, to stimulate and to enhance hair growth [Right-click to bookmark this link]
Former [1988/45]Preparation to revive, to stimulate and to enhance hair growth
[1991/33]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  25.10.1996
Database last updated on 18.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip25.07.2008Change - opposition data/opponents data or that of the opponents representativepublished on 27.08.2008  [2008/35]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Mai, Jutta
Bohlingen, Fabrikstrasse 18
D-78224 Singen / DE
For all designated states
Mai, Heinz
Bohlingen, Fabrikstrasse 18
D-78224 Singen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1988/45]For all designated states
Mai, Jutta
Bohlingen, Fabrikstrasse 18
D-78224 Singen / DE
For all designated states
Mai, Heinz
Bohlingen, Fabrikstrasse 18
D-78224 Singen / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Mai, Jutta
Fabrikstr. 16
D-7700 Singen-Bohlingen / DE
[1991/33]
Former [1988/45]01 / Mai, Jutta
Fabrikstrasse 16
D-7700 Singen-Bohlingen / DE
Representative(s)Weiss, Peter
Dr. Weiss & Arat
Partnerschaftsgesellschaft
Postfach 12 50
78229 Engen / DE
[N/P]
Former [1988/45]Weiss, Peter, Dr. rer.nat.
Dr. Peter Weiss & Partner Postfach 12 50
D-78229 Engen / DE
Application number, filing date87106650.207.05.1987
[1988/45]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0289639
Date:09.11.1988
Language:DE
[1988/45]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0289639
Date:14.08.1991
Language:DE
[1991/33]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0289639
Date:11.12.1996
Language:DE
[1996/50]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.09.1987
ClassificationInternational:A61K7/06, A61K31/455
[1988/45]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1988/45]
TitleGerman:Verwendung von Trigonellin zum Wiederbeleben und zum Anregen und Verstärken des Haarwuchses[1991/33]
English:Use of trigonellin to revive, to stimulate and to enhance hair growth[1991/33]
French:Utilisation de la trigonelline pour ranimer, stimuler et renforcer la pousse des cheveux[1991/33]
Former [1988/45]Mittel zum Wiederbeleben und zum Anregen und Verstärken des Haarwuchses
Former [1988/45]Preparation to revive, to stimulate and to enhance hair growth
Former [1988/45]Moyen pour ranimer, stimuler et renforcer la pousse des cheveux
Examination procedure09.05.1989Examination requested  [1989/29]
30.03.1990Request for accelerated examination filed
27.06.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04)
27.06.1990Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes
07.08.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
17.10.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
14.12.1990Fee for grant paid
14.12.1990Fee for publishing/printing paid
27.12.1990Communication of intention to grant the patent
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  16.10.1991  31.03.1992  ADMISSIBLE
Erwin Stückler
Haselbachstr. 18
D-79809 Weilheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Hiebsch, Gerhard F.
Hiebsch Behrmann Wagner Patentanwälte Hegau-Tower Maggistrasse 5 (10. OG)
78224 Singen / DE
 [N/P]
Former [2008/35]
Opponent(s)01  16.10.1991  31.03.1992  ADMISSIBLE
Erwin Stückler
Haselbachstr. 18
D-79809 Weilheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Hiebsch, Gerhard F.
Hiebsch Behrmann Nüsse Patentanwälte Postfach 464
78204 Singen / DE
Former [1991/50]
Opponent(s)01  16.10.1991  31.03.1992  ADMISSIBLE
Erwin Stückler
Haselbachstr. 18
D-79809 Weilheim / DE
Opponent's representative
Hiebsch, Gerhard F., Dipl.-Ing.
Hiebsch & Peege Patentanwälte Postfach 464
D-78204 Singen / DE
deletedDeletion: Legal effect of rejection of opposition [ N /P ]
01.07.1992Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
26.08.1992Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
21.01.1994Date of despatch of rejection of opposition
07.02.1996Fee for printing new specification paid
08.03.1996Despatch of a communication from the opposition division (Time limit: M02)
12.03.1996Reply to a communication from the opposition division
27.06.1996Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
06.07.1996Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
30.09.1996Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
Appeal following opposition08.02.1994Appeal received No.  T0143/94
16.05.1994Statement of grounds filed
06.10.1995Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
06.10.1995Date of oral proceedings
12.10.1995Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
31.05.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
19.05.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
07.05.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR14.08.1991
LU07.05.1993
SE08.05.1993
NL01.12.1993
[2004/38]
Former [2000/04]GR14.08.1991
SE08.05.1993
LU31.05.1993
NL01.12.1993
Former [1994/25]SE08.05.1993
NL01.12.1993
Former [1994/16]SE08.05.1993
Documents cited:Search[A]JP56032409  ;
 [A]DE3118882  (NORONHA RUDOLF V DR RER NAT DI)
 [A]  - THE MERCK INDEX, 7. Auflage, 1960, Merck & Co. Inc. Verlag, US;
    [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 94, Nr.13, 30 März 1981, Columbus, OH (US); F.SZEGO et al., Seite 381, Nr.109080t
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 94, Nr. 13, 30. M{rz 1981, Seite 381, Spalte 1, Zusammenfassungsnr. 109080t, Columbus, Ohio, US; F. SZEGO et al.: "Cosmetic products containing nicotinates", & HUNG. APPL. 1980
    [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 79, Nr.4, 30 Juli 1973, Columbus, OH (US); E.MARTTINEN et al., Seite 330, Nr.23508s
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 79, Nr. 4, 30. Juli 1973, Seite 330, Spalte 2, Zusammenfassungsnr. 23508s, Columbus, Ohio, US; E. MARTTINEN et al.: "Hair cosmetics"
    [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 95, Nr.10, 07 September 1981, Columbus, OH (US); SUNSTAR INC., Seite 329, Nr.86147z
 [A]  - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, Band 95, Nr. 10, 7. September 1981, Seite 329, spalte 1, Zusammenfassungsnr. 86147z, Columbus, Ohio, US; SUNSTAR INC. "Hair tonics containing vitamin B6 nicotinic acid esters", & JP-A-56 032 409 (SUNSTAR INC.), & JP56032409 A 00000000