Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0245795

EP0245795 - Contact element for electrical pluggable connectors [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  11.09.1993
Database last updated on 28.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip05.09.2008Change - representativepublished on 08.10.2008  [2008/41]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
OTTO DUNKEL GMBH FABRIK FÜR ELEKTROTECHNISCHE GERÄTE
Herzog-Friedrich-Strasse 3
84453 Mühldorf / DE
[N/P]
Former [1987/47]For all designated states
OTTO DUNKEL GMBH FABRIK FÜR ELEKTROTECHNISCHE GERÄTE
Herzog-Friedrich-Strasse 3
D-84453 Mühldorf / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Molitor, Paul-Rainer
Buchnerstrasse 38
D-8260 Mühldorf / DE
[1987/47]
Representative(s)Leinweber & Zimmermann
European Patent Attorneys
Patentanwälte
Viktualienmarkt 8
80331 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [2008/41]Leinweber & Zimmermann
European Patent Attorneys Patentanwälte Rosental 7
80331 München / DE
Former [1987/47]Patentanwälte Leinweber & Zimmermann
Rosental 7/II Aufg.
D-80331 München / DE
Application number, filing date87106708.808.05.1987
[1987/47]
Priority number, dateDE1986361591512.05.1986         Original published format: DE 3615915
[1987/47]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0245795
Date:19.11.1987
Language:DE
[1987/47]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0245795
Date:31.01.1990
Language:DE
[1990/05]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0245795
Date:11.11.1992
Language:DE
[1992/46]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP12.12.1989
ClassificationInternational:H01R13/187, H01R13/17, H01R43/16
[1990/02]
Former International [1987/47]H01R13/187
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1987/47]
TitleGerman:Kontaktelement für elektrische Steckverbinder[1987/47]
English:Contact element for electrical pluggable connectors[1987/47]
French:Elément de contact pour connecteurs électriques enfichables[1987/47]
Examination procedure16.03.1990Examination requested  [1990/20]
02.04.1992Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
11.05.1992Communication of intention to grant the patent
19.08.1992Fee for grant paid
19.08.1992Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)12.08.1993No opposition filed within time limit [1993/44]
Fees paidRenewal fee
24.05.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
21.05.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
29.05.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
29.05.1992Renewal fee patent year 06
Lapses during opposition  TooltipGR11.11.1992
AT08.05.1993
GB08.05.1993
SE09.05.1993
ES10.05.1993
BE31.05.1993
CH31.05.1993
LI31.05.1993
LU31.05.1993
[2004/37]
Former [2000/04]GR11.11.1992
AT08.05.1993
GB08.05.1993
SE09.05.1993
BE31.05.1993
CH31.05.1993
LI31.05.1993
LU31.05.1993
Former [1994/46]AT08.05.1993
GB08.05.1993
SE09.05.1993
BE31.05.1993
CH31.05.1993
LI31.05.1993
Former [1994/25]GB08.05.1993
SE09.05.1993
BE31.05.1993
CH31.05.1993
LI31.05.1993
Former [1994/22]GB08.05.1993
SE09.05.1993
CH31.05.1993
LI31.05.1993
Former [1994/18]SE09.05.1993
CH31.05.1993
LI31.05.1993
Former [1994/16]SE09.05.1993
Documents cited:Search[A]GB2013421  (BONHOMME F R);
 [A]DE578727  (CHARLES REGINALD COOK);
 [A]US3086190  (RUDOLF NEIDECKER, et al);
 [A]GB2157099  (DUNKEL OTTO GMBH)