blank Quick help
blank Maintenance news

Scheduled maintenance

Regular maintenance outages:
between 05.00 and 05.15 hrs CET (Monday to Sunday).

Other outages
Availability

2022.02.11

More...
blank News flashes

News Flashes

Latvia joins the Federated Register
Click here for more information on the Federated Register.

2025-04-16

More...
blank Related links

Extract from the Register of European Patents

EP About this file: EP0246548

EP0246548 - Method for making a discharge container for compact low-pressure discharge lamps [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusNo opposition filed within time limit
Status updated on  12.01.1991
Database last updated on 19.04.2025
Most recent event   Tooltip12.01.1991No opposition filed within time limitpublished on 06.03.1991 [1991/10]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
81543 München / DE
[N/P]
Former [1989/35]For all designated states
Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
D-81543 München / DE
Former [1987/48]For all designated states
Patent-Treuhand-Gesellschaft für elektrische Glühlampen mbH
Hellabrunner Strasse 1
D-8000 München 90 / DE
Inventor(s)01 / Klein, Lutz
Marderweg 5
D-8900 Augsburg / DE
02 / Panofski, Ernst
Hochfeldstrasse 3
D-8900 Augsburg / DE
03 / Plischke, Josef
Pfirsichweg 28
D-8900 Augsburg / DE
04 / Eckstein, Gerd-Otto, Dr.
Pfrontener Strasse 10 1/2
D-8900 Augsburg / DE
05 / Schmidt, Hans
Bergiusstrasse 80
D-8900 Augsburg / DE
[1990/12]
Former [1987/48]01 / Klein, Lutz
Marderweg 5
D-8900 Augsburg / DE
02 / Panofski, Ernst
Hochfeldstrasse 3
D-8900 Augsburg / DE
03 / Plischke, Josef
Pfirsichweg 28
D-8900 Augsburg / DE
04 / Eckstein. Gerd-Otto, Dr.
Pfrontener Strasse 10 1/2
D-8900 Augsburg / DE
05 / Schmidt, Hans
Bergiusstrasse 80
D-8900 Augsburg / DE
Application number, filing date87106881.312.05.1987
[1987/48]
Priority number, dateDE1986361698621.05.1986         Original published format: DE 3616986
DE1987370767910.03.1987         Original published format: DE 3707679
[1987/48]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A1 Application with search report 
No.:EP0246548
Date:25.11.1987
Language:DE
[1987/48]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0246548
Date:21.03.1990
Language:DE
[1990/12]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP08.09.1987
ClassificationIPC:C03B23/07, C03B23/06, C03B23/04, H01J61/30
[1987/48]
CPC:
C03B23/0493 (EP,US); C03B23/07 (EP,KR,US); C03B23/06 (EP,KR,US);
C03B23/065 (EP,US); Y02B20/00 (EP,US)
Designated contracting statesDE,   FR,   GB,   IT [1987/48]
TitleGerman:Verfahren zur Herstellung eines Entladungsgefässes für kompakte Niederdruckentladungslampen[1987/48]
English:Method for making a discharge container for compact low-pressure discharge lamps[1987/48]
French:Procédé pour la fabrication d'un réservoir à décharge pour lampes compactes à décharge à basse pression[1987/48]
Examination procedure18.12.1987Examination requested  [1988/08]
07.09.1988Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
22.02.1989Reply to a communication from the examining division
22.06.1989Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
13.09.1989Communication of intention to grant the patent
25.09.1989Fee for grant paid
25.09.1989Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)22.12.1990No opposition filed within time limit [1991/10]
Fees paidRenewal fee
29.05.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
Opt-out from the exclusive  Tooltip
competence of the Unified
Patent Court
See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court.
Documents cited:Search[XP]DE3544465  (TUNGSRAM RESZVENYTARSASAG [HU]);
 [Y]US1948560  (GEORGE BORNEMAN);
 [YD]EP0061758  (PATENT TREUHAND GES FUER ELEKTRISCHE GLUEHLAMPEN MBH [DE]);
 [A]US3679385  (SENFT STEPHEN P);
 [A]US3263852  (FRIDRICH ELMER G);
 [A]FR2322448  (PHILIPS NV [NL])
The EPO accepts no responsibility for the accuracy of data originating from other authorities; in particular, it does not guarantee that it is complete, up to date or fit for specific purposes.