Extract from the Register of European Patents

About this file: EP0268013

EP0268013 - Canned motor pump or pump with an encased magnetic coupling [Right-click to bookmark this link]
StatusPatent maintained as amended
Status updated on  15.11.1996
Database last updated on 15.02.2020
Most recent event   Tooltip19.06.2009Lapse of the patent in a contracting state
New state(s): ES
published on 22.07.2009  [2009/30]
Applicant(s)For all designated states
Reinecker, Heyko
Rötebuckweg 60
D-79104 Freiburg / DE
[1988/21]
Inventor(s)01 / Kraemer, Roland, Dr.
Reinhold-Schneider-str. 6
D-7803 Gundelfingen / DE
02 / Neumaier, Robert
Am Ohrensbaechle 28
D-7804 Glottertal / DE
[1988/21]
Representative(s)Schmitt, Hans , et al
Maucher, Börjes & Kollegen Dreikönigstrasse 13
79102 Freiburg / DE
[N/P]
Former [1988/21]Schmitt, Hans, Dipl.-Ing. , et al
Patentanwälte Dipl.-Ing. H. Schmitt Dipl.-Ing. W. Maucher Dreikönigstrasse 13
D-79102 Freiburg / DE
Application number, filing date87108088.304.06.1987
[1988/21]
Priority number, dateDE1986363972020.11.1986         Original published format: DE 3639720
[1988/21]
Filing languageDE
Procedural languageDE
PublicationType: A2 Application without search report 
No.:EP0268013
Date:25.05.1988
Language:DE
[1988/21]
Type: A3 Search report 
No.:EP0268013
Date:29.03.1989
Language:DE
[1989/13]
Type: B1 Patent specification 
No.:EP0268013
Date:02.10.1991
Language:DE
[1991/40]
Type: B2 New European patent specification 
No.:EP0268013
Date:02.01.1997
Language:DE
[1997/01]
Search report(s)(Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on:EP07.02.1989
ClassificationInternational:F04D13/06, F04D13/02, F04D15/02
[1988/21]
Designated contracting statesAT,   BE,   CH,   DE,   ES,   FR,   GB,   GR,   IT,   LI,   LU,   NL,   SE [1988/21]
TitleGerman:Pumpe mit Spaltrohr[1991/40]
English:Canned motor pump or pump with an encased magnetic coupling[1988/21]
French:Pompe avec moteur électrique à rotor noyé ou avec accouplement magnétique[1988/21]
Former [1988/21]Pumpe mit Spaltrohrmotor-oder Spaltrohrmagnetkupplungsantrieb
Examination procedure05.04.1989Examination requested  [1989/23]
08.05.1990Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06)
12.09.1990Reply to a communication from the examining division
13.11.1990Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes)
19.03.1991Communication of intention to grant the patent
28.03.1991Fee for grant paid
28.03.1991Fee for publishing/printing paid
Opposition(s)Opponent(s)01  24.06.1992  23.07.1992  ADMISSIBLE
Franz Klaus Union Armaturen, Pumpen GmbH & Co
Blumenfeldstr. 18
D-44795 Bochum / DE
Opponent's representative
Kalkoff, Heinz-Dieter
Patentanwälte Wenzel & Kalkoff
Martin-Schmeisser-Weg 3a-3b
44227 Dortmund / DE
 02  24.06.1992  23.07.1992  ADMISSIBLE
KSB Aktiengesellschaft
Johann-Klein-Strasse 9
67227 Frankenthal / DE
 03  01.07.1992  23.07.1992  ADMISSIBLE
SIHI GmbH & Co. KG
Lindenstrasse 170
D-25524 Itzehoe / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll
Partnerschaft mbB von
Patent- und Rechtsanwälten
Postfach 26 01 62
80058 München / DE
 04  02.07.1992  31.07.1992  ADMISSIBLE
Richter Chemie-Technik GmbH
Otto-Schott-Strasse 2
D-47906 Kempen / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz, Helge B.
Cohausz Hannig Borkowski Wissgott
Patentanwaltskanzlei GbR
Schumannstrasse 97-99
40237 Düsseldorf / DE
 [N/P]
Former [1992/35]
Opponent(s)01  24.06.1992  23.07.1992  ADMISSIBLE
Franz Klaus Union Armaturen, Pumpen GmbH & Co
Blumenfeldstr. 18
D-44795 Bochum / DE
Opponent's representative
Kalkoff, Heinz-Dieter, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Wenzel & Kalkoff Postfach 24 48
D-58414 Witten / DE
 02  24.06.1992  23.07.1992  ADMISSIBLE
KSB Aktiengesellschaft
Johann-Klein-Strasse 9
D-67227 Frankenthal / DE
 03  01.07.1992  23.07.1992  ADMISSIBLE
SIHI GmbH & Co. KG
Lindenstrasse 170
D-25524 Itzehoe / DE
Opponent's representative
Glawe, Delfs, Moll & Partner
Patentanwälte Postfach 26 01 62
D-80058 München / DE
 04  02.07.1992  31.07.1992  ADMISSIBLE
Richter Chemie-Technik GmbH
Otto-Schott-Strasse 2
D-47906 Kempen / DE
Opponent's representative
Cohausz, Helge B., Dipl.-Ing.
Cohausz Hase Dawidowicz & Partner Schumannstrasse 97-99
D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE
Former [1992/34]
Opponent(s)01  24.06.1992  23.07.1992  ADMISSIBLE
Franz Klaus Union Armaturen, Pumpen GmbH & Co
Blumenfeldstr. 18
D-44795 Bochum / DE
Opponent's representative
Kalkoff, Heinz-Dieter, Dipl.-Ing.
Patentanwälte Wenzel & Kalkoff Postfach 24 48
D-58414 Witten / DE
 02  24.06.1992  23.07.1992  ADMISSIBLE
KSB Aktiengesellschaft
Johann-Klein-Strasse 9
D-67227 Frankenthal / DE
10.07.1992No. 01: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
10.07.1992No. 03: Notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
14.07.1992No. 01: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
17.07.1992No. 03: Reply to notification indicating deficiencies in the notice of opposition
12.08.1992Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition
07.12.1992Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition
16.07.1996Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition
16.07.1996Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition
20.09.1996Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended
31.10.1996Fee for printing new specification paid
Appeal following opposition14.08.1993Appeal received No.  T0752/93
11.11.1993Statement of grounds filed
16.07.1996Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form
16.07.1996Date of oral proceedings
25.07.1996Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
25.09.1995Date of oral proceedings
29.09.1995Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched
Fees paidRenewal fee
03.04.1989Renewal fee patent year 03
22.03.1990Renewal fee patent year 04
04.05.1991Renewal fee patent year 05
Lapses during opposition  TooltipBE02.10.1991
FR02.10.1991
GB02.10.1991
GR02.10.1991
IT02.10.1991
NL02.10.1991
SE02.10.1991
AT04.06.1992
CH30.06.1992
ES30.06.1992
LI30.06.1992
LU30.06.1992
[2009/30]
Former [2006/14]BE02.10.1991
FR02.10.1991
GB02.10.1991
GR02.10.1991
IT02.10.1991
NL02.10.1991
SE02.10.1991
AT04.06.1992
CH30.06.1992
LI30.06.1992
LU30.06.1992
Former [2000/04]BE02.10.1991
GB02.10.1991
GR02.10.1991
IT02.10.1991
NL02.10.1991
SE02.10.1991
FR28.02.1992
AT04.06.1992
CH30.06.1992
LI30.06.1992
LU30.06.1992
Former [1999/52]BE02.10.1991
GB02.10.1991
IT02.10.1991
NL02.10.1991
SE02.10.1991
FR28.02.1992
AT04.06.1992
CH30.06.1992
LI30.06.1992
LU30.06.1992
Former [1999/42]BE02.10.1991
GB02.10.1991
IT02.10.1991
NL02.10.1991
SE02.10.1991
FR28.02.1992
AT04.06.1992
CH30.06.1992
LI30.06.1992
Former [1994/25]BE02.10.1991
GB02.10.1991
NL02.10.1991
SE02.10.1991
FR28.02.1992
AT04.06.1992
CH30.06.1992
LI30.06.1992
Former [1993/13]BE02.10.1991
GB02.10.1991
NL02.10.1991
SE02.10.1991
FR28.02.1992
CH30.06.1992
LI30.06.1992
Former [1992/37]BE02.10.1991
GB02.10.1991
NL02.10.1991
SE02.10.1991
FR28.02.1992
Former [1992/34]GB02.10.1991
NL02.10.1991
SE02.10.1991
FR28.02.1992
Former [1992/26]NL02.10.1991
SE02.10.1991
Former [1992/21]SE02.10.1991
Documents cited:Search[X]SU684679  ;
 [X]DE3337086
 [X]  - SOVIET INVENTIONS ILLUSTRATED, Woche C19, 18. Juni 1980, Sektion Q, Zusammenfassung Nr. 34022, Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & SU-A-684 679 (FEDOROV) 08-09-1979, & SU684679 A 00000000